This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/26/2022 at 13:22:48 (UTC).

MERZ NORTH AMERICA, INC. VS MAJID SABOUR MD PC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 03/11/2022 MERZ NORTH AMERICA, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MAJID SABOUR MD PC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL L. STERN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8865

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL L. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MERZ NORTH AMERICA INC.

Defendant

MAJID SABOUR MD PC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRODKIN ALAN L.

 

Court Documents

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

6/9/2022: Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE) OF 05/05/2022

5/5/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE) OF 05/05/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

5/5/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/11/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Declaration - DECLARATION SUMMARY OF CASE

5/11/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION SUMMARY OF CASE

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/11/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION RE: PRE-JUDGMENT INTEREST

5/11/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION RE: PRE-JUDGMENT INTEREST

Declaration Pursuant to 1717.5 CC re: Attorney Fees

5/11/2022: Declaration Pursuant to 1717.5 CC re: Attorney Fees

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

5/11/2022: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Dismissal

5/12/2022: Request for Dismissal

Case Management Statement

5/13/2022: Case Management Statement

Judgment - JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT

5/16/2022: Judgment - JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

5/16/2022: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT)

5/16/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT) OF 05/16/2022, DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

5/16/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT) OF 05/16/2022, DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/11/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

3/11/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/11/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2022
  • Hearing10/07/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketApplication and Order for Appearance and Examination; Filed by MERZ NORTH AMERICA, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • Docketat 10:45 AM in Department 62; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 62; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • Docketat 4:18 PM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Default Judgment by Court) of 05/16/2022, Default Judgment by Court); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re Default Judgment by Court)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketJudgment (by Default by Court); Filed by MERZ NORTH AMERICA, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by MERZ NORTH AMERICA, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by MERZ NORTH AMERICA, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • Docketat 10:15 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service) of 05/05/2022); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by MERZ NORTH AMERICA, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MERZ NORTH AMERICA, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MERZ NORTH AMERICA, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less