This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/13/2023 at 03:48:45 (UTC).

MERLINA LOZADA VS KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/18/2023 MERLINA LOZADA filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0199

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOZADA MERLINA

Defendants

KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC.

KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS

KHALEDY MOHAMMAD CYRUS M.D.

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP

SUH ANNIE Y M.D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCNULTY PETER J

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/18/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

1/18/2023: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/18/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/18/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/20/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

2/14/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/14/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/14/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/14/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/14/2023: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2023
  • Hearing05/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department U at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Merlina Lozada (Plaintiff); As to: Annie Y Suh, M.D. (Defendant); Service Date: 02/13/2023; Service Cost: 123.25; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Merlina Lozada (Plaintiff); As to: Kaiser Foundation Hospitals (Defendant); Service Date: 02/03/2023; Service Cost: 95.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Merlina Lozada (Plaintiff); As to: Mohammad Cyrus Khaledy, M.D. (Defendant); Service Date: 02/13/2023; Service Cost: 145.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Merlina Lozada (Plaintiff); As to: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 02/03/2023; Service Cost: 95.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Merlina Lozada (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Permanente Medical Group (Defendant); Service Date: 02/03/2023; Service Cost: 95.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Merlina Lozada (Plaintiff); As to: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. (Defendant); Kaiser Foundation Hospitals (Defendant); Southern California Permanente Medical Group (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Merlina Lozada (Plaintiff); As to: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. (Defendant); Kaiser Foundation Hospitals (Defendant); Southern California Permanente Medical Group (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Merlina Lozada (Plaintiff); As to: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. (Defendant); Kaiser Foundation Hospitals (Defendant); Southern California Permanente Medical Group (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Valerie Salkin in Department U Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less