This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/01/2020 at 15:58:41 (UTC).

MERILEE RHODEN VS DRYBAR HOLDINGS LLC

Case Summary

On 09/05/2018 MERILEE RHODEN filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against DRYBAR HOLDINGS LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK V. MOONEY. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0556

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK V. MOONEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

RHODEN MERILEE

Defendants and Respondents

DRYBAR HOLDINGS LLC

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BANERJEE ARNAB

Defendant Attorneys

IRADJPANAH KEVIN KAYVAN

IRADJPANAH KEVIN K.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Settlement

12/31/2019: Notice of Settlement

Case Management Statement

9/18/2019: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

9/25/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

COMPLAINT - PAGA ENFORCEMENT ACTION

9/5/2018: COMPLAINT - PAGA ENFORCEMENT ACTION

Case Management Statement

11/7/2019: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

12/31/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

2/21/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Declaration - Declaration OF K. KAYVAN IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER

2/8/2019: Declaration - Declaration OF K. KAYVAN IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

2/8/2019: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Case Management Statement

2/13/2019: Case Management Statement

Declaration - Declaration OF K. KAYVAN IRADJPANAH REGARDING GOOD FAITH EFFORT

10/19/2018: Declaration - Declaration OF K. KAYVAN IRADJPANAH REGARDING GOOD FAITH EFFORT

Case Management Statement

12/4/2018: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

12/13/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant Drybar Holdings LLC's Special Demurrer to Abate Plaintiff Merilee Rhoden's Complaint

11/20/2018: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant Drybar Holdings LLC's Special Demurrer to Abate Plaintiff Merilee Rhoden's Complaint

Case Management Statement

11/28/2018: Case Management Statement

Proof of Personal Service

10/30/2018: Proof of Personal Service

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

9/5/2018: NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

SUMMONS -

9/5/2018: SUMMONS -

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Merilee Rhoden (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Status Conference (Re Settlement) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Order); Filed by Merilee Rhoden (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Merilee Rhoden (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 12/31/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketDefendant Drybar Holdings, LLC's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendant Drybar Holdings LLC's Special Demurrer to Abate Plaintiff Merilee Rhoden's Complaint; Filed by Drybar Holdings, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Drybar Holdings, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Merilee Rhoden (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • DocketDeclaration (OF K. KAYVAN IRADJPANAH REGARDING GOOD FAITH EFFORT); Filed by Drybar Holdings, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Merilee Rhoden (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - PAGA ENFORCEMENT ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Drybar Holdings LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer K. KAYVAN IRADJPANAH