This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/04/2021 at 20:28:51 (UTC).

MERIBEAR PRODUCTIONS, INC. VS MATT GEORGE

Case Summary

On 08/13/2021 MERIBEAR PRODUCTIONS, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MATT GEORGE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0076

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MERIBEAR PRODUCTIONS INC.

Defendant

GEORGE MATT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEVITON STUART LAWRENCE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/13/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/13/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/13/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/26/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2021
  • Hearing12/10/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 52 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Meribear Productions, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Meribear Productions, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Meribear Productions, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MERIBEAR PRODUCTIONS INC. DBA MERIDITH BAER HOME is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVITON STUART L.