This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/24/2019 at 01:23:08 (UTC).

MERIBEAR PRODUCTIONS, INC. VS JOSEPH G LOPEZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/29/2019 MERIBEAR PRODUCTIONS, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JOSEPH G LOPEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6481

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MERIBEAR PRODUCTIONS INC. DBA MERIDITH BAER HOME

Defendants

LOPEZ JOSEPH G

KILKEA GROUP INC.

LOPEZ JOSEPH G.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LEVITON STUART LAWRENCE

LEVITON STUART L.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/29/2019: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/29/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/29/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/29/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/13/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/4/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

12/3/2019: Case Management Statement

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/7/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/7/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/7/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/7/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2020
  • Hearing01/15/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 34 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: re Entry of Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 34; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Meribear Productions, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Meribear Productions, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Meribear Productions, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Meribear Productions, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Meribear Productions, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Meribear Productions, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Meribear Productions, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Meribear Productions, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STCV26481    Hearing Date: January 15, 2020    Dept: 34

PLAINTIFF’S REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

BACKGROUND:

On July 29, 2019, Plaintiff Meribear Productions, Inc., a California corporation dba Meridith Baer Home commenced this action against Kilkea Group Inc. and Joseph G. Lopez for (1) breach of contract; and (2) common counts. Plaintiff seeks damages in the amount of $130,000.00 (minimum), plus interest at the rate of 10% per year, plus attorney’s fees not less than $2,500.00. (Complaint, ¶ 10.) Plaintiff alleges that Defendants failed to pay the amounts due and owing and failed to return inventory. (Complaint, BC-2.)

ANALYSIS:

The request for entry of default judgment is GRANTED as indicated below.

Default Judgment

Category

Amount Requested

Amount Granted

Demand of Complaint

$143,652.38

$143,652.38

General Damages

$0.00

Special Damages

$0.00

Interest

$5,386.96

$5,386.96

Costs

$563.50

$563.50

Attorney's fees

$2,500.00

$2,500.00

$152,102.84

$152,102.84

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MERIBEAR PRODUCTIONS INC. DBA MERIDITH BAER HOME is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVITON STUART L.