This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/19/2021 at 20:51:48 (UTC).

MERIBEAR PRODUCTIONS, INC. VS HAGOP SARGISSIAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/15/2021 MERIBEAR PRODUCTIONS, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HAGOP SARGISSIAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAURICE A. LEITER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6134

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAURICE A. LEITER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MERIBEAR PRODUCTIONS INC. DBA MERIDITH BAER HOME

Defendants

1314 SUNSET PLAZA DRIVE LLC AKA 1314 SUNSET PLAZA LLC

SARGISSIAN HAGOP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEVITON STUART LAWRENCE

Defendant Attorney

ECOFF LAWRENCE C.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/16/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/15/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

7/15/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/13/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Mail

8/2/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Answer

9/13/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/28/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

9/28/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

10/12/2021: Case Management Statement

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/12/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2022
  • Hearing01/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 54 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 54, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Meribear Productions, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Meribear Productions, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Hagop Sargissian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Hagop Sargissian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Hagop Sargissian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Meribear Productions, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Meribear Productions, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Meribear Productions, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Meribear Productions, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Meribear Productions, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MERIBEAR PRODUCTIONS INC. DBA MERIDITH BAER HOME is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVITON STUART L.