This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/20/2022 at 03:08:34 (UTC).

MERIBEAR PRODUCTIONS INC VS 1060 PALMS LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/01/2017 MERIBEAR PRODUCTIONS INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against 1060 PALMS LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is YOLANDA OROZCO. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5175

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

YOLANDA OROZCO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MERIBEAR PRODUCTIONS INC. DBA MERIDITH BAER HOME

Defendants

1060 PALMS LLC

GUTTMAN YONI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEVITON STUART L.

 

Court Documents

Declaration - DECLARATION OF STUART L. LEVITON RE DILIGENCE IN SERVING SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

11/29/2018: Declaration - DECLARATION OF STUART L. LEVITON RE DILIGENCE IN SERVING SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE FAILUR...)

6/13/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE FAILUR...)

Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing - NOTICE OF REJECTION - EX PARTE APPLICATION WITHOUT HEARING FOR PUBLICATION RE: YONI & 1060 PALMS

7/15/2019: Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing - NOTICE OF REJECTION - EX PARTE APPLICATION WITHOUT HEARING FOR PUBLICATION RE: YONI & 1060 PALMS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE FAILUR...)

8/13/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE FAILUR...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE FAILUR...)

9/27/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE FAILUR...)

Application for Publication

11/8/2019: Application for Publication

Application for Publication

11/8/2019: Application for Publication

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SERVICE BY PUBLICATON)

11/22/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SERVICE BY PUBLICATON)

Order for Publication - ORDER FOR PUBLICATION FOR 1060 PALMS, LLC

1/7/2020: Order for Publication - ORDER FOR PUBLICATION FOR 1060 PALMS, LLC

Order for Publication - ORDER FOR PUBLICATION FOR YONI

1/7/2020: Order for Publication - ORDER FOR PUBLICATION FOR YONI

Proof of Publication

2/6/2020: Proof of Publication

Proof of Publication

2/6/2020: Proof of Publication

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/11/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/11/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/17/2020

3/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/17/2020

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/22/2020

4/22/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/22/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/22/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Submission of Corrected Judgment) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Meribear Productions, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • Docketat 5:14 PM in Department 31, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 10/13/2020); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by Meribear Productions, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Entry of Default and Default Judgment) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default and Default Judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Meribear Productions, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Meribear Productions, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
72 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-03-23 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketNOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-CONTRACT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Meribear Productions, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****5175    Hearing Date: October 01, 2020    Dept: 31

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT IS GRANTED; CORRECTED JUDGMENT REQUIRED. 

On December 1, 2017, Plaintiff Meribear Productions, Inc. dba Meridith Baer Home filed the instant action against Defendants 1060 Palms, LLC; Yoni Guttman; and Does 1 through 20. On May 31, 2018, Plaintiff filed the First Amended Complaint (“FAC”). The FAC asserts causes of action for:

  1. Breach of Contract;

  2. Common Counts; and

  3. Detinue.

On July 2, 2020, default was entered as to 1060 Palms, LLC and Yoni Guttman (hereinafter collectively referred to as “Defendants”). On September 28, 2020, Plaintiff dismissed the Doe Defendants without prejudice.

Plaintiff seeks judgment against Defendants in the amount of $358,542.14 consisting of $286,455.70 in damages, $66,787.42 in interest, $2,799.10 in costs, and $2,500.00 in attorney fees.

Plaintiff has submitted the requisite documentation and provided sufficient evidence to support the judgment sought. However, the Court notes that pre-judgment interest calculated from May 31, 2018 to the date of entry of default judgment, October 1, 2020, is $67,022.79.

Based on the foregoing, Plaintiff’s request for entry of default judgment is GRANTED. Default judgment is entered in the amount of $358,777.59, consisting of $286,455.70 in damages, $67,022.79 in pre-judgment interest, $2,799.10 in costs, and $2,500.00 in attorney fees. Plaintiff must e-file a corrected proposed judgment at least 2 court days before the hearing.

The parties are strongly encouraged to attend all scheduled hearings virtually or by audio. Effective July 20, 2020, all matters will be scheduled virtually and/or with audio through the Court’s LACourtConnect technology. The parties are strongly encouraged to use LACourtConnect for all their matters. All social distancing protocols will be observed at the Co


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MERIBEAR PRODUCTIONS INC. DBA MERIDITH BAER HOME is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVITON STUART L.