This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/27/2021 at 02:41:15 (UTC).

MERI AKOPYAN VS JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY;, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 MERI AKOPYAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7539

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AKOPYAN MERI

Defendants

JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY;

PENEGON WEST INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION D/B/A HORNBURG JAGUAR/LAND ROVER;

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KALOUSTIAN HARRY S

Defendant Attorney

TAKAHASHI BRIAN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/12/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/12/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

11/3/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/3/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/26/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Answer

12/17/2021: Answer

Answer

12/17/2021: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2022
  • Hearing02/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 36 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by PENEGON WEST, INC., a California Corporation d/b/a HORNBURG JAGUAR/LAND ROVER; (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company; (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by MERI AKOPYAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by MERI AKOPYAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by MERI AKOPYAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MERI AKOPYAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MERI AKOPYAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PENEGON WEST INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA HORNBURG JAGUAR/LAND ROVER is a litigant

Latest cases where Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAKAHASHI, BRIAN