This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/13/2021 at 16:32:49 (UTC).

MEREDITH KLEIN ET AL VS DO LAB INC

Case Summary

On 04/11/2018 MEREDITH KLEIN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DO LAB INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CHRISTOPHER K. LUI and DANIEL M. CROWLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1553

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

DELLAVECHHIA FRANCIS

KLEIN MEREDITH

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Defendants

DO LAB INC.

DOES 1 TO 50

URIOSTE CRISTINA

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

URIOSTE CRISTINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

ERNST TAYLOR

ERNST DON A.

Defendant, Respondent and Cross Defendant Attorneys

BREMER KEITH G. ESQ.

BREMER KEITH GLENN ESQ.

WEINSTEIN MARK ALAN

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

WEINSTEIN MARK ALAN

ROBIN ELLIS PAUL

 

Court Documents

Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT CRISTINA URIOSTES REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD

11/24/2020: Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT CRISTINA URIOSTES REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD

Request - REQUEST AMENDED REQUEST TO PRESENT ORAL EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS PETITION

11/24/2020: Request - REQUEST AMENDED REQUEST TO PRESENT ORAL EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS PETITION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFENDANT DO LAB, INC.'S MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD;...)

12/3/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFENDANT DO LAB, INC.'S MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD;...)

Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING NT OF LODGING - JASON FLEMMING DEPO TRANSCRIPT (PART 1 TRANSCRIPT)

11/5/2020: Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING NT OF LODGING - JASON FLEMMING DEPO TRANSCRIPT (PART 1 TRANSCRIPT)

Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING NT OF LODGING - JASON FLEMMING DEPO TRANSCRIPT (PART 2 EXHIBITS)

11/5/2020: Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING NT OF LODGING - JASON FLEMMING DEPO TRANSCRIPT (PART 2 EXHIBITS)

Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

8/3/2020: Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ELLIS ROBIN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD

10/8/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ELLIS ROBIN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF CRISTINA URIOSTE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD

10/8/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF CRISTINA URIOSTE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT

7/13/2020: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT

7/13/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFENDANT DO LAB INC.'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE OF COU...)

7/14/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFENDANT DO LAB INC.'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE OF COU...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/14/2020

4/14/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/14/2020

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 14

1/21/2020: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 14

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 16

1/21/2020: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 16

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME...)

2/6/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME...)

Answer - ANSWER TO THE CROSS-COMPLAINT

8/6/2019: Answer - ANSWER TO THE CROSS-COMPLAINT

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

4/26/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

4/11/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

86 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2021
  • Hearing04/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • Docketat 12:58 PM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Lodged Media in Support of Motion) of 12/14/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Lodged Media in Support of Motion)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Order (Evidentiary Hearing Confirmation of Arbitration Award) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Vacate (Arbitration Award) - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Vacate (Arbitration Award) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other (Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Defendant Do Lab, Inc.'s Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award;...) of 12/03/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
105 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketComplaint (1st); Filed by Francis DellaVechhia (Plaintiff); Meredith Klein (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Francis DellaVechhia (Plaintiff); Meredith Klein (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Do Lab, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketDO LAB, INC.'S ANSWER TO THE: COMPLAINT OF. MEREDITH KLEIN AND FRANCIS DELLAVECCHIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Francis DellaVechhia (Plaintiff); Meredith Klein (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Francis DellaVechhia (Plaintiff); Meredith Klein (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC701553    Hearing Date: December 03, 2020    Dept: 28

The court has received Plaintiff's Petition to Enforce the Arbitration Award and Defendants' Motion to Vacate same.  Based upon the court's preliminary review of the papers submitted, the court finds that live witness testimony will not be needed at the hearing on the matter. 

The court hopes to have a tentative decision posted late tomorrow afternoon.