Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/27/2021 at 07:26:16 (UTC).

MERCURY INSURANCE GROUP VS CESAR SANCHEZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/20/2020 MERCURY INSURANCE GROUP filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CESAR SANCHEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0249

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MERCURY INSURANCE GROUP

Defendants

SANCHEZ CESAR

HANC

SANCHEZ MARIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PLESSALA BRIAN M.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE)

1/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE)

Notice of Related Case

12/10/2020: Notice of Related Case

Motion to Consolidate

12/11/2020: Motion to Consolidate

PI General Order

11/5/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURE AND HEARING DATES

11/5/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURE AND HEARING DATES

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/21/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

10/20/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/20/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2023
  • Hearing10/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • Hearing04/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • Hearing04/05/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Consolidate - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Consolidate)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketMotion to Consolidate; Filed by Mercury Insurance Group (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Mercury Insurance Group (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedure and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Mercury Insurance Group (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Mercury Insurance Group (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STCV40249    Hearing Date: January 08, 2021    Dept: 27

On October 20, 2020, Mercury Insurance Group filed this action against Cesar Maria  a June 19, 2015 multi-vehicle accident.  Mercury seeks to consolidate its petition to compel arbitration with an ongoing action captioned , LASC Case No. BC665206

“When actions involving a common question of law or fact are pending before the court, it may order a joint hearing or trial of any or all the matters in issue in the actions; it may order all the actions consolidated and it may make such orders concerning proceedings therein as may tend to avoid unnecessary costs or delay.”  (Code Civ. Proc. § 1048, subd. (a).)  The purpose of consolidation is to enhance trial court efficiency by avoiding unnecessary duplication of evidence and the danger of inconsistent adjudications.  (See Todd-Stenberg v. Dalkon Shield Claimants Trust

However, the motion for consolidation is procedurally deficient.  There is no court order deeming the cases related into the same department.  “Cases may not be consolidated unless they are in the same department.  A motion to consolidate two or more cases may be noticed and heard after the cases, initially filed in different departments, have been related into a single department, or if the cases were already assigned to that department.”  (Super. Ct. L.A. County, Local Rules, rule 3.3(g)(1).)

Accordingly, the Motion to consolidate is DENIED without prejudice.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MERCURY INSURANCE GROUP INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PLESSALA BRIAN MARTIN