This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/25/2023 at 07:27:59 (UTC).

MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY VS ROBERT M GREGORY

Case Summary

On 01/11/2023 MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ROBERT M GREGORY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0059

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

GREGORY ROBERT M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CASTRONOVO TOD MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/11/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/11/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/11/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

1/12/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/12/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

2/10/2023: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE BY CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS FOR STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND WITH SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF RECORDS

3/9/2023: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE BY CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS FOR STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND WITH SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF RECORDS

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2023
  • Hearing06/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department S26 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • Hearing04/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department S26 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Hearing on Motion to Compel Compel Compliance by Custodian of Records for State Compensation Insurance with Depo Subpoena for Production of Business Records; Request for Sanctions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Compel Compliance by Custodian of Records for State Compensation Insurance with Depo Subpoena for Production of Business Records; Request for Sanctions scheduled for 04/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketMotion to Compel Motion to Compel Compliance by Custodian of Records for State Compensation Insurance Fund with Subpoena for Production of Records; Filed by: Mercury Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Robert M Gregory (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S26 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 02/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by: Mercury Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Robert M Gregory (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael P. Vicencia in Department S26 Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Mercury Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Robert M Gregory (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Mercury Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Robert M Gregory (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less