This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/28/2022 at 15:29:12 (UTC).

MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY VS AMICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/16/2021 MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against AMICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D. STEWART. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1038

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM D. STEWART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

AMICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

JONES DEWAYNE D.

PETROV MARTIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

O'CONNOR LEE P.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/17/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

12/17/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/16/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

12/16/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration - DECLARATION OF COUNSEL IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE

2/22/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF COUNSEL IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE

Request for Dismissal

4/18/2022: Request for Dismissal

Case Management Statement

4/14/2022: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/5/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/5/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/15/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

2/28/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Mercury Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Mercury Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Mercury Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Mercury Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Mercury Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (of Counsel in Response to Order to Show Cause Re Failure to File Proof of Service); Filed by Mercury Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Mercury Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Mercury Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Mercury Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less