This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/01/2021 at 09:26:34 (UTC).

MERCRY PIMENTEL VS ALEX HUERTA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/15/2019 MERCRY PIMENTEL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ALEX HUERTA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH and GLORIA WHITE-BROWN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9008

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

GLORIA WHITE-BROWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PIMENTEL MERCRY

REYES DE PIMENTEL ARILUZ

Defendants and Cross Defendants

HUERTA ALEX

AZUSA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

CENTER MIDDLE SCHOOL

HUERTA SILVIA

HUERTA JAVIER

LUEVANO SILVIA

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

AZUSA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HANNING NATHAN A

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

KANE MAURICE SYLVAN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling

10/23/2020: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/3/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Service by Mail

8/24/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/28/2020

4/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/28/2020

Answer - Answer 1st Cross-Complaint

2/11/2020: Answer - Answer 1st Cross-Complaint

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ALEX HUERTA

2/11/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ALEX HUERTA

Proof of Service by Mail

2/13/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

2/13/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Declaration - DECLARATION JAVIER HUERTA

2/13/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION JAVIER HUERTA

Answer - ANSWER TO 1ST CROSS-COMPLAINT

2/13/2020: Answer - ANSWER TO 1ST CROSS-COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

2/18/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Ruling

2/20/2020: Notice of Ruling

Case Management Statement

2/6/2020: Case Management Statement

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/31/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER: ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (...) OF 12/17/2019

12/17/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER: ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (...) OF 12/17/2019

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/4/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER] AND STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

3/21/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER] AND STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/15/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2022
  • Hearing01/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department J at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • Hearing01/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department J at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Azusa Unified School District (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J, Gloria White-Brown, Presiding; Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J, Gloria White-Brown, Presiding; Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J, Gloria White-Brown, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Sanctions for Plaintiff's Failure to Appear) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Azusa Unified School District (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Mercry Pimentel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Azusa Unified School District (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Mercry Pimentel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Mercry Pimentel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Mercry); Filed by Ariluz Reyes De Pimentel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing (for Mercry)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Nathan A Hanning (Attorney); Mercry Pimentel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Nathan A Hanning (Attorney); Mercry Pimentel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STCV09008    Hearing Date: December 17, 2019    Dept: 5

 

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 5

MERCURY PIMENTEL,

Plaintiff,

v.

ALEX HUERTA, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: 19STCV09008

Hearing Date: December 17, 2019

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

DefendantS’ MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Defendant Azusa Unified School District seeks leave to file a cross-complaint against Co-Defendant Alex Huerta and his parents, Javier Huerta and Silvia Leuvano because the proposed cross-complaint asserts claims for indemnity, declaration relief, and parental liability and failure to warn, all of which arise out of the incident at issue in this litigation. The motion is not opposed. Therefore, the motion is granted.

CONCLUSION AND ORDER

Defendant’s motion for leave to file a cross-complaint is granted. Defendant shall file its cross-complaint within ten (10) days. Defendant shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: December 17, 2019 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AZUSA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT A GOVERNMENT ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HANNING NATHAN A