This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/15/2023 at 23:10:00 (UTC).

MERCHANT CAPITAL GROUP, LLC VS. VALERI MESROPYAN

Case Summary

On 08/27/2018 MERCHANT CAPITAL GROUP, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VALERI MESROPYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SHIRLEY K. WATKINS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7716

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SHIRLEY K. WATKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MERCHANT CAPITAL GROUP LLC DBA GREENBOX CAPITAL

Defendant

MESROPYAN VALERI DBA FAST LANE TRANSPORTATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRIEDMAN JOSHUA P

 

Court Documents

Complaint -

8/27/2018: Complaint -

Notice -

8/27/2018: Notice -

Civil Case Cover Sheet -

8/27/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet -

Summons -

8/27/2018: Summons -

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice -

9/27/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice -

Proof of Service by Substituted Service -

10/9/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service -

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

11/8/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice]

11/21/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice]

Request for Dismissal

11/7/2018: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/7/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Other - - Summary of Case Pursuant to Cal Rules of Court, Rule 3.1800(A)(1)

1/14/2019: Other - - Summary of Case Pursuant to Cal Rules of Court, Rule 3.1800(A)(1)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

1/14/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Judgment - Judgment - Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial - 01/14/2019 entered for Plaintiff Merchant Capital Group, LLC DBA Greenbox Capital against Defendant Mesropyan, Valeri DBA Fast Lane Tra

1/14/2019: Judgment - Judgment - Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial - 01/14/2019 entered for Plaintiff Merchant Capital Group, LLC DBA Greenbox Capital against Defendant Mesropyan, Valeri DBA Fast Lane Tra

Declaration - Declaration of Plaintiff for Entry of Court Judgment Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure 585(d)

1/14/2019: Declaration - Declaration of Plaintiff for Entry of Court Judgment Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure 585(d)

Case Management Statement

12/13/2018: Case Management Statement

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

01/14/2019

DocketProceeding/Event:Conference-Case Management Elaine W. Mandel 8:30 am

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/14/2019

DocketJudgment - Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial - 01/14/2019 entered for Plaintiff Merchant Capital Group, LLC DBA Greenbox Capital against Defendant Mesropyan, Valeri DBA Fast Lane Transportation. Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/14/2019

DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff Merchant Capital Group, LLC DBA Greenbox Capital against Defendant Mesropyan, Valeri DBA Fast Lane Transportation on the Complaint filed by MERCHANT CAPITAL GROUP, LLC on 08/27/2018 for damages of $56,391.01, attorney fees of $2,017.82, interest of $15,001.55, and costs of $567.16 for a total of $73,977.54.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/14/2019

DocketDeclaration of Plaintiff for Entry of Court Judgment Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure 585(d); Filed by: Merchant Capital Group, LLC (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/14/2019

DocketSummary of Case Pursuant to Cal Rules of Court, Rule 3.1800(A)(1); Filed by: Merchant Capital Group, LLC (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/14/2019

DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/14/2019

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/14/2019 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department T updated: Result Date to 01/14/2019; Result Type to Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/11/2019

DocketUpdated -- Valeri Mesropyan (Defendant): Middle Name: blank

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/11/2019

DocketUpdated -- Merchant Capital Group, LLC (Plaintiff): Organization Name changed from Merchant Capital Group, LLC to Merchant Capital Group, LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/13/2018

DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Merchant Capital Group, LLC (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
11/07/2018

Docket; On the Complaint filed by MERCHANT CAPITAL GROUP, LLC on 08/27/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2018

DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Merchant Capital Group, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Valeri Mesropyan (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2018

DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Merchant Capital Group, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Valeri Mesropyan (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/21/2018; Service Cost: 132.16; Service Cost Waived: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2018

DocketDocument:Notice-Reassignment and Order Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2018

DocketProceeding/Event:Order Re: Reassignment Of Case Elaine W. Mandel

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/27/2018

DocketCalendaring:Conference-Case Management 01/14/19 at 8:30 am Elaine W. Mandel

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/27/2018

DocketCase Filed/Opened:Othr Breach Contr/Warr-not Fraud

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/27/2018

DocketDocument:Complaint Filed by: N/A

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/27/2018

DocketDocument:Summons Issued Filed by: N/A

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/27/2018

DocketDocument:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less