This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/14/2019 at 00:41:30 (UTC).

MERCHANT CAPITAL GROUP, LLC VS AMIR HADIM

Case Summary

On 09/05/2018 MERCHANT CAPITAL GROUP, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AMIR HADIM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9779

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GREENBOX CAPITAL

MERCHANT CAPITAL GROUP LLC

CAPITAL GREENBOX

Defendants and Not Classified By Court

HADIM AMIR

BEVERLY HILLS MARKETING

CAPITAL GREENBOX

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRIEDMAN JOSHUA P.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

1/31/2019: Minute Order

Unknown

1/31/2019: Unknown

Unknown

12/17/2018: Unknown

Unknown

12/17/2018: Unknown

Unknown

12/17/2018: Unknown

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

11/16/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Settlement

12/12/2018: Notice of Settlement

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/3/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Summons

9/5/2018: Summons

Complaint

9/5/2018: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/5/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

9/21/2018: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

03/04/2019

at 08:30 AM in Department O; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/04/2019

at 08:30 AM in Department O; Order to Show Cause - Hearing (reDismissal Date) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/04/2019

at 08:30 AM in Department O; Order to Show Cause - Hearing (reDismissal Date) - Not Held - Clerical Error

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2019

at 08:30 AM in Department O; Order to Show Cause - Hearing (reDismissal Date) - Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2019

Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause - Hearing re: Dismissal Date)); Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2019

Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Order to Show Cause - Hearing re: Dismissal Date) of 01/31/2019); Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/17/2018

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/17/2018

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/17/2018

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/12/2018

Notice of Settlement; Filed by MERCHANT CAPITAL GROUP, LLC (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
09/21/2018

Proof of Personal Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2018

Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2018

Complaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2018

Civil Case Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2018

Summons

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2018

Notice; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2018

Summons; Filed by Plaintiff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2018

Complaint Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2018

Notice (NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ); Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2018

Complaint; Filed by MERCHANT CAPITAL GROUP, LLC (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less