This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/28/2019 at 00:29:20 (UTC).

MERCEEDES TAYLOR VS TORRANCE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 10/11/2017 MERCEEDES TAYLOR filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TORRANCE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8789

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Guardian Ad Litem and Plaintiff

TAYLOR ROBERT

Respondents and Defendants

DOES 1 TO 30

TORRANCE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Minor

TAYLOR MERCEEDES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

HAMBLET BRIAN INMAN

Minor Attorney

LEDERER & NOJIMA LLP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

10/11/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

11/27/2017: NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL

11/27/2017: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL

Stipulation and Order

3/6/2019: Stipulation and Order

Answer

12/21/2018: Answer

Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

12/18/2018: Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

DECLARATION OF LAUREN T. KRAPF AND REQUEST FOR EXTENSION FOR CITY OF SANTA CLARITA PURSUANT TO CCP 430.41(A)(2)

5/3/2018: DECLARATION OF LAUREN T. KRAPF AND REQUEST FOR EXTENSION FOR CITY OF SANTA CLARITA PURSUANT TO CCP 430.41(A)(2)

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/19/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

SUMMONS

2/6/2018: SUMMONS

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL

1/25/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Stipulation And Order); Filed by TORRANCE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by TORRANCE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District) (1st stip cont. 3 mos. FSC 3-27-18 to 7-1-19; Trl 4-11-19 to 7-11-19); Filed by TORRANCE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketComplaint (First Amended Complaint); Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • DocketDECLARATION OF LAUREN T. KRAPF AND REQUEST FOR EXTENSION FOR CITY OF SANTA CLARITA PURSUANT TO CCP 430.41(A)(2)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by ROBERT TAYLOR (Legacy Party); MERCEEDES TAYLOR (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****8789    Hearing Date: December 11, 2019    Dept: 4A

Motion for Trial Preference

Having considered Plaintiff's moving papers and Defendant's statement of non-opposition, the Court rules as follows.

BACKGROUND

On October 11, 2017, Plaintiff Merceedes Taylor, by and through her guardian ad litem Robert Taylor, (“Plaintiff”) filed a complaint against Defendant Torrance Unified School District (“Defendant”) alleging negligence and premises liability for burns sustained on September 26, 2016.

On November 8, 2019, Plaintiff filed a motion for trial preference pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure section 36, subdivision (b).

Trial is set for February 11, 2020.

PARTYS REQUEST

Plaintiff asks the Court for a preferential trial date to be set within 120 days from the date Plaintiff’s motion is granted based on Plaintiff’s age.

LEGAL STANDARD

California Code of Civil Procedure section 36 states, in relevant part: “(b) A civil action to recover damages for wrongful death or personal injury shall be entitled to preference upon the motion of any party to the action who is under 14 years of age unless the court finds the party does not have a substantial interest in the case as a whole. . . . (f) Upon the granting of such a motion for preference, the court shall set the matter for trial not more than 120 days from that date. . . .

DISCUSSION

Plaintiff is four years of age.  (Davadi Decl., 3.)  The Court finds Plaintiff has a substantial interest in this action because her injuries give rise to this action.  Defendant has submitted a notice of non-opposition to this motion.  Accordingly, Plaintiff’s motion for trial preference must be granted pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure section 36, subdivision (b).

Therefore, Plaintiff’s motion is GRANTED.

The Court CONTINUES the trial date to April 8, 2020 and the final status conference to March 25, 2020.  Both hearings are to take place in Department 4A at Spring Street Courthouse located at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, California 90012.  All discovery and motion cut-off dates will be set in accordance with the April 9, 2020 trial date.

Plaintiff is ordered to give notice of this ruling.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TORRANCE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAMBLET BRIAN I. ESQ.