This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/19/2021 at 09:25:50 (UTC).

MERCEDES PENAHERRERA VS ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICE CONCEPTS, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/16/2021 MERCEDES PENAHERRERA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICE CONCEPTS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5943

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PENAHERRERA MERCEDES

Defendants

MACY'S INC.

ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICE CONCEPTS LLC

TAUBMAN CENTERS INC. INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA THE BEVERLY CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

KINGSTON PAUL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

2/16/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

3/11/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

3/11/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/22/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2024
  • Hearing02/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • Hearing08/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • Hearing08/02/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by MERCEDES PENAHERRERA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MERCEDES PENAHERRERA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MERCEDES PENAHERRERA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICE CONCEPTS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where MACY'S is a litigant

Latest cases where TAUBMAN CENTERS INC. is a litigant