This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/05/2023 at 18:18:54 (UTC).

MERCEDES-BENZ FINANCIAL SERVICES USA LLC VS MARTIN MARDYAN

Case Summary

On 01/11/2023 MERCEDES-BENZ FINANCIAL SERVICES USA LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MARTIN MARDYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0052

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MERCEDES-BENZ FINANCIAL SERVICES USA LLC

Defendant

MARDYAN MARTIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THOMAS VANESSA

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/11/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/11/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/11/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

1/11/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/11/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

1/11/2023: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2023
  • Hearing06/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department D at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • Hearing04/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department D at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: MERCEDES-BENZ FINANCIAL SERVICES USA LLC (Plaintiff); As to: MARTIN MARDYAN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: MERCEDES-BENZ FINANCIAL SERVICES USA LLC (Plaintiff); As to: MARTIN MARDYAN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: MERCEDES-BENZ FINANCIAL SERVICES USA LLC (Plaintiff); As to: MARTIN MARDYAN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ralph C. Hofer in Department D Glendale Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less