This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/02/2022 at 06:12:14 (UTC).

MERCEDES-BENZ FINANCIAL SERVICES USA LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS MEIYING TIAN, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/07/2022 MERCEDES-BENZ FINANCIAL SERVICES USA LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MEIYING TIAN, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0340

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MERCEDES-BENZ FINANCIAL SERVICES USA LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

STEVEN GORDON DIRECTOR OF THE CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLES A CALIFORNIA STATE AGENCY AS A NOMINAL DEFENDANT

TIAN AN INDIVIDUAL MEIYING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CALEY REBECCA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/8/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

6/8/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/7/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/7/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

6/7/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/7/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

7/26/2022: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/22/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2022
  • Hearing11/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department X at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • Hearing08/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department X at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MERCEDES-BENZ FINANCIAL SERVICES USA LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AS SERVICER FOR DAIMLER TRUST A DELAWARE STATUTORY TRUST is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CALEY REBECCA