Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/02/2021 at 16:08:56 (UTC).

MERCEDES-BENZ FINANCIAL SERVICES USA LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS CAMERON J. EDWARDS, JR., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/19/2021 MERCEDES-BENZ FINANCIAL SERVICES USA LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CAMERON J EDWARDS, JR . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0215

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MERCEDES-BENZ FINANCIAL SERVICES USA LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

EDWARDS CAMERON J. JR. AKA CAMERON J. EDWARDS

STEVE GORDON DIRECTOR OF THE CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLES A CALIFORNIA STATE AGENCY AS A NOMINAL DEFENDANT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

CALEY REBECCA

 

Court Documents

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

3/24/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/19/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/19/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/19/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

2/19/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2021
  • Hearing09/17/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department T at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MERCEDES-BENZ FINANCIAL SERVICES USA LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AS SERVICER FOR DAIMLER TRUST A DELAWARE STATUTORY TRUST is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CALEY REBECCA