This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/09/2019 at 05:23:19 (UTC).

MENTH, NORMAN L. - IN THE MATTER OF

Case Summary

On 05/05/2017 MENTH, NORMAN L - IN THE MATTER OF was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PENNY, BRENDA J.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3948

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PENNY, BRENDA J.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MENTH BRADLEY C.

Not Classified By Court

MENTH NORMAN L.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

HAWKINS HOWARD RALPH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2018
  • Order - Nunc Pro Tunc (Correcting Order )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • Ex Parte - Application Nunc Pro Tunc Order; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Order (Order Establishing Fact of Death ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • in Probate Department 99, Penny, Brenda J., Presiding; Establish Fact Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • DISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • Declaration (Howard R. Hawkins ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • in Probate Department 99, Penny, Brenda J., Presiding; Establish Fact Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • in Probate Department 99, Penny, Brenda J., Presiding; Establish Fact Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • Supplement (Establish Fact, Time, and Place of Death ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • Supplement (Supplement ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • Notice - Hearing (Notice of Hearing ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • in Probate Department 99, Penny, Brenda J., Presiding; Establish Fact Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • Declaration (In support of petition to establish fact, time, and place ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • Petition - Establish Fact of Death (Initial); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • Cover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less