This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/14/2020 at 06:29:07 (UTC).

MENJIVAR, WILMER HUMBERTO VS FERNANDEZ, GLORIA MELISSA

Case Summary

On 10/09/2019 MENJIVAR, WILMER HUMBERTO filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against FERNANDEZ, GLORIA MELISSA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RIFF, LAWRENCE P.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0008

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RIFF, LAWRENCE P.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MENJIVAR WILMER HUMBERTO

Respondent

FERNANDEZ GLORIA MELISSA

Not Classified By Court

LACEY JACKIE - District Attorney

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

03/10/2020

Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2, Riff, Lawrence P., Presiding; Habeas Corpus Hearing - Held - Case Dismissed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2020

DocketMinute Order as Order After Hearing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2020

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/13/2020

Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2, Riff, Lawrence P., Presiding; Habeas Corpus Hearing - Held - Continued

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/13/2020

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/11/2020

Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 2, Riff, Lawrence P., Presiding; Ex Parte Hearing - Granted - In Part

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/11/2020

DocketEx Parte - Application; Filed by Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/11/2020

DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given); Filed by Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/11/2020

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/15/2020

Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2, Riff, Lawrence P., Presiding; Habeas Corpus Hearing - Held - Continued

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
11/15/2019

DocketApplication (for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Order ); Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2019

DocketMiscellaneous (rit of Habeas Corpus ); Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/12/2019

Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2, Riff, Lawrence P., Presiding; Habeas Corpus Hearing - Held - Continued

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/12/2019

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2019

DocketApplication (for Writ of Hebeas Corpus and Order ); Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2019

DocketMiscellaneous (Points and Authorities ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2019

DocketMiscellaneous (Writ of Hebeas Corpus ); Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2019

DocketPetition - Habeas Corpus - Family Law; Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2019

DocketNotice (of Application for the Return of Minor Child ); Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2019

DocketMiscellaneous (Memorandum of Law ); Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less