Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/16/2021 at 20:37:27 (UTC).

MENDOZA, SOFIA ALEJANDRA VS. MENDOZA, RAMON OMAR

Case Summary

On 10/06/2020 MENDOZA, SOFIA ALEJANDRA filed a Family - Legal Separation lawsuit against MENDOZA, RAMON OMAR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is POWELL, MICHAEL R.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9902

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Legal Separation

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

POWELL, MICHAEL R.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MENDOZA SOFIA ALEJANDRA

Respondent

MENDOZA RAMON OMAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CATENA ANTHONY JOSEPH

Respondent Attorney

SKLAN JEFFREY FREDRICH

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service - Mail

4/6/2021: Proof of Service - Mail

Declaration - Separate Property

1/19/2021: Declaration - Separate Property

Declaration - UCCJEA

1/19/2021: Declaration - UCCJEA

Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property

1/19/2021: Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property

Responsive Declaration

1/19/2021: Responsive Declaration

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

1/19/2021: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

FCS - Agreement

1/28/2021: FCS - Agreement

Declaration - Income and Expense

2/2/2021: Declaration - Income and Expense

Proof of Service - Mail - Income & Expense Declaration and 3 attached paystubs

2/2/2021: Proof of Service - Mail - Income & Expense Declaration and 3 attached paystubs

Minute Order

2/5/2021: Minute Order

Stipulation and Order - No Fee

2/5/2021: Stipulation and Order - No Fee

Notice - of Related Case: 20STFL09647;

10/27/2020: Notice - of Related Case: 20STFL09647;

Declaration - UCCJEA

10/16/2020: Declaration - UCCJEA

Certificate of Completion

10/16/2020: Certificate of Completion

Proof of Service - FL300; FL150

10/16/2020: Proof of Service - FL300; FL150

Summons

10/6/2020: Summons

Notice - Case Assignment

10/6/2020: Notice - Case Assignment

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

10/6/2020: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2021
  • Hearing09/28/2021 at 8:30 AM in Department 22 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause re: Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 22, Powell, Michael R., Presiding; FCCR Conference - Held - Order Made

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Separate Property; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketPetition - Legal Separation w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CATENA ANTHONY JOSEPH