Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/23/2021 at 08:32:46 (UTC).

MENDOZA, MARIA CHRISTINA VS DOAN, KARONIE

Case Summary

On 04/29/2020 MENDOZA, MARIA CHRISTINA filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against DOAN, KARONIE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SHORT, MICHELLE and WEISS, SUSAN K. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0517

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SHORT, MICHELLE

WEISS, SUSAN K

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MENDOZA MARIA CHRISTINA

Respondent

DOAN KARONIE

 

Court Documents

Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

9/23/2020: Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

Minute Order

9/23/2020: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

8/26/2020: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

8/26/2020: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

7/15/2020: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

7/15/2020: Minute Order

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

4/29/2020: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

4/29/2020: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Petition - Civil Harassment

4/29/2020: Petition - Civil Harassment

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

4/29/2020: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/29/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department F48, Weiss, Susan K, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketStipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department F48, Short, Michelle, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department F48, Short, Michelle, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109) (Partly granted ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketPetition - Civil Harassment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less