Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/26/2021 at 21:11:31 (UTC).

MENCO GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS LIEF ORGANICS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/19/2021 MENCO GROUP, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against LIEF ORGANICS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0219

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MENCO GROUP INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

LIEF ORGANICS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

DEFENDANT REXFORD INDUSTRIAL REALTY LP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FLORES ALDO A

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

3/19/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/19/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/19/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/22/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2022
  • Hearing03/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department F47 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by MENCO GROUP, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MENCO GROUP, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MENCO GROUP, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LIEF ORGANICS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FLORES ALDO A.