This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/12/2021 at 07:21:06 (UTC).

MENACHEM MEDEL GROSSBAUM VS AGGIE N. REECE

Case Summary

On 03/17/2017 MENACHEM MEDEL GROSSBAUM filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against AGGIE N REECE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CRAIG D. KARLAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7251

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CRAIG D. KARLAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GROSSMAN CHAYA MUSHKA

GROSSBAUM MENACHEM MENDEL

Defendants

THE AGGIE N. REECE TRUST

REECE AGGIE N.

Other

VOSS SILVERMAN & BRAYBROOKE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MASSERAT SASSAN J.

DARREN D. DARWISH

DARWISH DARREN D.

Defendant Attorneys

PHILLIPS FIRM. THE

KOZICH S. DAVID

VOSS SILVERMAN & BRAYBROOKE

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - With Prejudice

7/9/2018: Request for Dismissal - With Prejudice

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2018
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department N; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department WEN, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Final Status Conference (DISMISSAL FILED) - Advanced to this date & Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by MENACHEM MENDEL GROSSBAUM (Plaintiff); CHAYA MUSHKA GROSSMAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Dismissal ( WITH PREJ., ENTIRE ACTION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by MENACHEM MENDEL GROSSBAUM (Plaintiff); CHAYA MUSHKA GROSSMAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketNotice-Settlement; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • DocketStipulation; Filed by AGGIE N. REECE (Defendant); THE AGGIE N. REECE TRUST (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • DocketStipulation (TO CONTINUE THE MEDIATION COMPLETION DATE; ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 06/13/2017
  • DocketNotice; Filed by MENACHEM MENDEL GROSSBAUM (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by AGGIE N. REECE (Defendant); THE AGGIE N. REECE TRUST (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • DocketNtc and Acknowledgement of Receipt; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by MENACHEM MENDEL GROSSBAUM (Plaintiff); CHAYA MUSHKA GROSSMAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by MENACHEM MENDEL GROSSBAUM (Plaintiff); CHAYA MUSHKA GROSSMAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MENACHEM MENDEL GROSSBAUM (Plaintiff); CHAYA MUSHKA GROSSMAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VOSS SILVERMAN & BRAYBROOKE LLP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KOZICH S. DAVID