Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/06/2021 at 00:14:11 (UTC).

MENA, JESSICA IRENE VS MENA, JOSE ANTONIO

Case Summary

On 03/29/2021 MENA, JESSICA IRENE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MENA, JOSE ANTONIO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3428

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MENA JESSICA IRENE

Respondent

MENA JOSE ANTONIO

 

Court Documents

Summons

3/29/2021: Summons

Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

3/29/2021: Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

3/29/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Denied FW003

4/7/2021: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Denied FW003

Proof of Service of Summons

4/23/2021: Proof of Service of Summons

Notice - Case Assignment

4/2/2021: Notice - Case Assignment

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

4/2/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Denied FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less