This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/17/2019 at 20:23:56 (UTC).

MEMPHIS ROCCHIE VS CHILDRENS HOSPITAL LOS ANGELES ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/08/2017 MEMPHIS ROCCHIE filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against CHILDRENS HOSPITAL LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1427

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Defendants

CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL LOS ANGELES

CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL L.A. MED. GRP. DOE 21

KUHN M.D. KRISTI

LAMPHIER M.D. KYLE

Guardian Ad Litem

CARCAMO CLAUDIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

WEISS DAVID J.

STOCKALPER REBACK MCANDREWS KJAR WARFORD

KJAR MCKENNA & STOCKALPER LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

1/30/2018: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

SUMMONS

2/7/2018: SUMMONS

Unknown

2/13/2018: Unknown

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE DISMISSAL OF INDIVIDUALLYNAMED DEFENDANT KYLE LAMPHIER, M.D.

2/15/2018: STIPULATION AND ORDER RE DISMISSAL OF INDIVIDUALLYNAMED DEFENDANT KYLE LAMPHIER, M.D.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

2/21/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE DISMISSAL OF INDIVIDUALLY NAMED DEFENDANT CALVIN LOWE M.D.

4/26/2018: STIPULATION AND ORDER RE DISMISSAL OF INDIVIDUALLY NAMED DEFENDANT CALVIN LOWE M.D.

Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

12/13/2018: Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

Notice

2/22/2019: Notice

Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

2/22/2019: Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

Notice of Change of Firm Name

5/31/2019: Notice of Change of Firm Name

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

1/11/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

1/18/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

DEFENDANT KYLE LAMPHIER, M.D.'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

11/21/2017: DEFENDANT KYLE LAMPHIER, M.D.'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Unknown

11/13/2017: Unknown

DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

11/13/2017: DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

11/15/2017: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

DECLARATION RE TRIAL ATTORNEY

11/15/2017: DECLARATION RE TRIAL ATTORNEY

DEFENDANT CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL LOS ANGELES MEDICAL GROUP'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

11/3/2017: DEFENDANT CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL LOS ANGELES MEDICAL GROUP'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by Children's Hospital L.A. Med. gRP. Doe 21 (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketNotice (RE CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE DATES PURSUANT TO STIPULATION AND ORDER); Filed by Children's Hospital Los Angeles (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District) (-FSC:7-9-19 Trial:7-15-19); Filed by Children's Hospital Los Angeles (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Children's Hospital Los Angeles (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • DocketStipulation and Order; Filed by Calvin Lowe, M.D., (Dismissed) (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER RE DISMISSAL OF INDIVIDUALLY NAMED DEFENDANT CALVIN LOWE M.D.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • DocketOrd Apptng Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (FICTITIOUS/INCORRECT NAME)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint; Filed by Memphis Rocchie (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES NEGLIGENCE ON BEHALF OF MEMPHIS ROCCHE; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****1427    Hearing Date: February 07, 2020    Dept: 32

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 32

MEMPHIS ROCCHIE,

Plaintiff,

v.

CHILDREN’S HOSPITAL LOS ANGELES, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: ****1427

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

petition to approve compromises of pending action

The Court has reviewed the petition by Petitioner Claudia Carcamo on behalf of Claimant Memphis Alexander Yojcom Carcamo and finds the settlement fair and reasonable. The Court is prepared to approve the settlement.

DATED: February 7, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WEISS, DAVID J