Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/07/2021 at 13:06:47 (UTC).

MELVIN WEBB VS DENNIS GODWIN

Case Summary

On 03/11/2021 MELVIN WEBB filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DENNIS GODWIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9709

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WEBB MELVIN

Defendant

GODWIN DENNIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EISNER ALEXANDER C.

Defendant Attorney

SALDANA KATHRYN

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

4/2/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

4/2/2021: PI General Order

Answer

4/6/2021: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/11/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/11/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/11/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/11/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2024
  • Hearing03/07/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • Hearing09/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • Hearing08/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Dennis Godwin (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Melvin Webb (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Melvin Webb (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Melvin Webb (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer EISNER ALEXANDER C