This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/25/2023 at 12:00:47 (UTC).

MELVIN HICKS VS MXNXOXP INC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/24/2023 MELVIN HICKS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MXNXOXP INC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0209

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HICKS MELVIN

Defendants

HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY

MXNXOXP INC DBA CARWORLD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FALER MATTHEW

Defendant Attorney

GASCOU CHRISTIAN JEAN

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/24/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

1/24/2023: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/24/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/24/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

1/24/2023: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Complaint - COMPLAINT: 1. VIOLATION OF THE CONSUMER LEGAL REMEDIES ACT (C.C.C. Q 1750, ET SEQ.) 2. CLAIM AGAINST DEALER BOND 3. VIOLATION OF SONG-BEVERLY CONSUMER WARRANTY ACT IMPLIED WARRANTY

1/24/2023: Complaint - COMPLAINT: 1. VIOLATION OF THE CONSUMER LEGAL REMEDIES ACT (C.C.C. Q 1750, ET SEQ.) 2. CLAIM AGAINST DEALER BOND 3. VIOLATION OF SONG-BEVERLY CONSUMER WARRANTY ACT IMPLIED WARRANTY

Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE

1/24/2023: Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

1/27/2023: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/27/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

1/31/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/3/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer - ANSWER OF HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

2/28/2023: Answer - ANSWER OF HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

Request for Dismissal

3/22/2023: Request for Dismissal

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/23/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof Of Service; Failure to Prosecute Case; Failure to File Request For Entry of Default scheduled for 05/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/23/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Melvin Hicks on 01/24/2023, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Melvin Hicks as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Melvin Hicks (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal: Filed By: Melvin Hicks (Plaintiff); Result: Entered ; Result Date: 03/22/2023 ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketANSWER OF HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT; Filed by: Hudson Insurance Company (Defendant); As to: Melvin Hicks (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Melvin Hicks (Plaintiff); As to: MXNXOXP Inc (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 02/01/2023; Service Cost: 93.61; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Melvin Hicks (Plaintiff); As to: Hudson Insurance Company (Defendant); Service Date: 01/30/2023; Service Cost: 34.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof Of Service; Failure to Prosecute Case; Failure to File Request For Entry of Default scheduled for 05/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketCOMPLAINT: 1. Violation of the Consumer Legal Remedies Act (C.C.C. Q 1750, et seq.) 2. Claim Against Dealer Bond 3. Violation of Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act Implied Warranty; Filed by: Melvin Hicks (Plaintiff); As to: MXNXOXP Inc (Defendant); Hudson Insurance Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketAffidavit of Venue; Filed by: Melvin Hicks (Plaintiff); As to: MXNXOXP Inc (Defendant); Hudson Insurance Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Melvin Hicks (Plaintiff); As to: MXNXOXP Inc (Defendant); Hudson Insurance Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketStatement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by: Melvin Hicks (Plaintiff); As to: MXNXOXP Inc (Defendant); Hudson Insurance Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Melvin Hicks (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Melvin Hicks (Plaintiff); As to: MXNXOXP Inc (Defendant); Hudson Insurance Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Deirdre Hill in Department M Torrance Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less