This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/31/2020 at 03:00:43 (UTC).

MELVIN AVILA , ; AN INDIVIDUAL; VS KIEWIT CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION; , ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/24/2019 MELVIN AVILA , AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against KIEWIT CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8140

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AVILA MELVIN ; AN INDIVIDUAL;

Defendants

AES SOUTHLAND ENERGY HOLDINGS II LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY;

AES CORPORATION A BUSINESS ENTITY OF FORM UNKNOWN;

AES SOUTHLAND ENERGY LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY;

KIEWIT CORPORATION A DELAWARE CORPORATION;

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HUANG SHANI KUPFERMAN

YANG SEUNG LYUN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/24/2019: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/24/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/24/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/24/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/24/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

6/11/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/18/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/17/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/13/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

7/2/2019: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/27/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

RETURNED MAIL - RETURNED MAIL NOTICE OF CMC

7/17/2019: RETURNED MAIL - RETURNED MAIL NOTICE OF CMC

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 10/02/2019

10/2/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 10/02/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/2/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 10/02/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL (Notice of CMC)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by KIEWIT CORPORATION, a Delaware corporation; (Defendant); AES CORPORATION, a business entity of form unknown; (Defendant); AES SOUTHLAND ENERGY, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company; (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Melvin Avila , ; an individual; (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Melvin Avila , ; an individual; (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Melvin Avila , ; an individual; (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Melvin Avila , ; an individual; (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Melvin Avila , ; an individual; (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Melvin Avila , ; an individual; (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Melvin Avila , ; an individual; (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Melvin Avila , ; an individual; (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AES SOUTHLAND ENERGY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where KIEWIT CORPORATION is a litigant