This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/24/2021 at 17:42:10 (UTC).

MELROSE HEIGHTS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS BOTTLIST WEHO, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/05/2021 MELROSE HEIGHTS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BOTTLIST WEHO, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2843

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff

MELROSE HEIGHTS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

JARJOUR PETER

ALMAZ NATASHA

BOTTLIST WEHO INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

WEISS ROBERT PETER

Defendant Attorneys

GREEN G. RICHARD

GREEN GLENN RICHARD

 

Court Documents

Exhibit List

11/2/2021: Exhibit List

Exhibit List

11/2/2021: Exhibit List

Trial Brief

11/2/2021: Trial Brief

Witness List

11/2/2021: Witness List

Witness List

11/2/2021: Witness List

Notice - DECLARATION OF EX PARTE NOTICE

11/3/2021: Notice - DECLARATION OF EX PARTE NOTICE

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION CONTINUE TRIAL

11/3/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION CONTINUE TRIAL

Declaration - DECLARATION SUPPLEMENTAL REGARDING EX PARTE APPICATION

11/4/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION SUPPLEMENTAL REGARDING EX PARTE APPICATION

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION CONT...) OF 11/05/2021

11/5/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION CONT...) OF 11/05/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION CONT...)

11/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION CONT...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER: ORDER ON STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE)

9/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER: ORDER ON STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE; [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON

9/2/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE; [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER: ORDER ON STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE) OF 09/02/2021

9/2/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER: ORDER ON STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE) OF 09/02/2021

Notice - NOTICE OF FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL

8/3/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/3/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Order

8/3/2021: Case Management Order

Notice - NOTICE CORRECTED NOTICE OF TRIAL

8/4/2021: Notice - NOTICE CORRECTED NOTICE OF TRIAL

Answer

6/14/2021: Answer

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2022
  • Hearing02/07/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 39 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • Hearing01/26/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 39 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 39; Non-Jury Trial ((2-3 day estimate)) - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 39; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 39; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (Continue Trial) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Final Status Conference; Hearing on Ex Parte Application Cont...) of 11/05/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Hearing on Ex Parte Application Cont...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Supplemental regarding Ex Parte Appication); Filed by Bottlist Weho, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Peter Jarjour (Defendant); Natasha Almaz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Ex Parte Notice; Filed by Bottlist Weho, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Peter Jarjour (Defendant); Natasha Almaz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketEx Parte Application (Continue Trial); Filed by Bottlist Weho, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Peter Jarjour (Defendant); Natasha Almaz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Unavailability); Filed by Melrose Heights, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Melrose Heights, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Melrose Heights, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Bottlist Weho, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Peter Jarjour (Defendant); Natasha Almaz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Bottlist Weho, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Peter Jarjour (Defendant); Natasha Almaz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Melrose Heights, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Melrose Heights, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Melrose Heights, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WEISS, ROBERT PETER