Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/05/2021 at 11:08:30 (UTC).

MELROSE CROSSING LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS BREATHER PRODUCTS US INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 12/15/2020 MELROSE CROSSING LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BREATHER PRODUCTS US INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD L. FRUIN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7970

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RICHARD L. FRUIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MELROSE CROSSING LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

MELROSE CROSSING LLC

Defendants

BREATHER PRODUCTS US INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

BREATHER PRODUCTS US INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NAHAI BEHZAD

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

2/26/2021: Request for Dismissal

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

2/26/2021: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

2/26/2021: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/26/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Summary of the Case

2/26/2021: Summary of the Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/1/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/3/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER; NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT;)

3/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER; NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT;)

Default Judgment - DEFAULT JUDGMENT JUDGMENT BY COURT BY DEFAULT

3/5/2021: Default Judgment - DEFAULT JUDGMENT JUDGMENT BY COURT BY DEFAULT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER; NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT;) OF 03/05/2021

3/5/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER; NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT;) OF 03/05/2021

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

3/11/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

3/11/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

Proof of Personal Service

12/29/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/15/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/15/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/15/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/15/2020: Complaint

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Judgment or Order); Filed by Melrose Crossing LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Judgment or Order); Filed by Melrose Crossing LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • Docketat 11:28 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order; Notice of Entry of Judgment by Default by Court;) of 03/05/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order; Notice of Entry of Judgment by Default by Court;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketDefault Judgment (Judgment by Court by Default); Filed by Melrose Crossing LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Melrose Crossing LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Melrose Crossing LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by Melrose Crossing LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketSummary of the Case; Filed by Melrose Crossing LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by Melrose Crossing LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (- Partial, without prejudice); Filed by Melrose Crossing LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Melrose Crossing LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Melrose Crossing LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Melrose Crossing LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Melrose Crossing LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer NAHAI BEHZAD