This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/10/2021 at 18:30:55 (UTC).

MELODY NISSANI VS JEWELERS MUTUAL INSURANCE GROUP, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/01/2021 MELODY NISSANI filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against JEWELERS MUTUAL INSURANCE GROUP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0435

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NISSANI MELODY

Defendants

JEWELERS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

JEWELERS MUTUAL INSURANCE GROUP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MCCREARY DUNCAN J.

MCCREARY DUNCAN J. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/9/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/1/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/1/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2021
  • Hearing11/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Melody Nissani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Melody Nissani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Melody Nissani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JEWELERS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCREARY DUNCAN