This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 01:51:34 (UTC).

MELODY MCCLENDON VS CW PIEDMONT LLC

Case Summary

On 07/14/2017 MELODY MCCLENDON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CW PIEDMONT LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RANDOLPH ROGERS and RANDOLPH A. ROGERS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7237

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RANDOLPH ROGERS

RANDOLPH A. ROGERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCCLENDON MELODY

Defendant

CW PIEDMONT LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

BRISKIN BORIS

SOTO ASHLEY GLYNN

LITCHFIELD CAVO LLP

ALLARIA MARC VICTOR

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Judgment

11/26/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment

Judgment

10/26/2018: Judgment

NOTICE OF RULING RE: HEARING ON DEFENDANT

8/27/2018: NOTICE OF RULING RE: HEARING ON DEFENDANT

DECLARATION

5/31/2018: DECLARATION

DEFENDANT'S COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

5/31/2018: DEFENDANT'S COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

DECLARATION

5/31/2018: DECLARATION

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

5/31/2018: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

5/31/2018: SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DECLARATION

5/31/2018: DECLARATION

DECLARATION

7/30/2018: DECLARATION

PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

7/30/2018: PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

INDEX OF DOCUMENTARY EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

7/30/2018: INDEX OF DOCUMENTARY EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS

8/9/2018: DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS

Minute Order

8/14/2018: Minute Order

DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

8/25/2017: DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/8/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

7/14/2017: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

SUMMONS

7/14/2017: SUMMONS

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A15, Randolph A. Rogers, Presiding; (OSC-Failure to File Judgment) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (in Favor of Defendant CW Piedmont LLC); Filed by CW Piedmont, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • DocketJudgment (in favor of Defendant CW Piedmont LLC and against Plaintiff Melody McClendon); Filed by CW Piedmont, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Misc. Docs; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A15; (Trial; Advanced to this date & continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A15; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Advanced to this date & continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF RULING RE: HEARING ON DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by CW Piedmont, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A15; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (Motion for Summary Judgment; Granted-Uncontested) -

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 08/08/2017
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by Melody Mcclendon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Melody Mcclendon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • DocketSECOND AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE PI COURT

    Read MoreRead Less