This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/20/2019 at 22:13:21 (UTC).

MELISSA ST CLAIR ET AL VS HEALTH NET OF CALIFORNIA INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/12/2017 MELISSA ST CLAIR filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against HEALTH NET OF CALIFORNIA INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERESA A. BEAUDET. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0849

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERESA A. BEAUDET

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ST. CLAIR MELISSA

Defendants

HEALTH NET OF CALIFORNIA INC.

ST. CLAIR ALYSIA

DOMA MATTHEW

HEALTHCARE LA IPA

MEDPOINT MANAGEMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CORBY TRAVIS MURRAY ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

PIMSTONE GREGORY N. ESQ.

WOLD JAMES G

MCDONOUGH ERIC ROBERT

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT HEALTH CARE LA IPA TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION RE: COMPLIANCE WITH CCP 430.41

12/14/2017: NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT HEALTH CARE LA IPA TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION RE: COMPLIANCE WITH CCP 430.41

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF COMPLIANCE WITH CCP 430.41

12/14/2017: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF COMPLIANCE WITH CCP 430.41

PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO HEALTHCARE LA'S MOTION TO STRIKE

1/29/2018: PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO HEALTHCARE LA'S MOTION TO STRIKE

PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO THE DEMURRER OF HEALTHCARE LA

1/29/2018: PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO THE DEMURRER OF HEALTHCARE LA

HEALTH CARE LA IPA'S REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

2/2/2018: HEALTH CARE LA IPA'S REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

HEALTH CARE LA IPA'S REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

2/2/2018: HEALTH CARE LA IPA'S REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order

2/9/2018: Minute Order

ORDER RE: DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT HEALTH CARE LA IPA

2/9/2018: ORDER RE: DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT HEALTH CARE LA IPA

PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANT HEALTHCARE LA'S MOTION TO STRIKE & DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

2/13/2018: PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANT HEALTHCARE LA'S MOTION TO STRIKE & DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL 1. WRONGFUL DEATH DUE TO THE BREACH OF THE IMPLIED DUTY OF GOOD FAITH AND FAITH DEALING; ETC.

3/1/2018: SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL 1. WRONGFUL DEATH DUE TO THE BREACH OF THE IMPLIED DUTY OF GOOD FAITH AND FAITH DEALING; ETC.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

3/2/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

AMENDED SUMMONS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/9/2018: AMENDED SUMMONS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

3/21/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT HEALTH CARE L.A. IPA TO PLAINTIFFS' UNVERIFIED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/21/2018: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT HEALTH CARE L.A. IPA TO PLAINTIFFS' UNVERIFIED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

DECLARATION OF JUSTIN JONES RODRIGUEZ; ETC.

3/23/2018: DECLARATION OF JUSTIN JONES RODRIGUEZ; ETC.

ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT HEALTH NET OF CALIFORNIA, INC.'S UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED DATES

3/23/2018: ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT HEALTH NET OF CALIFORNIA, INC.'S UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED DATES

Minute Order

3/23/2018: Minute Order

JOINDER OF HEALTH CARE LA. IPA TO EX PARTE APPLICATION OF HEALTH NET TO CONTINUE TRIAL, RESET ALL DATES PER CODE TO THE NEW TRIAL DATE, AND TO SET HEARING FOR MSJ'S PER CODE PRIOR TO NEW TRIAL DATE

3/23/2018: JOINDER OF HEALTH CARE LA. IPA TO EX PARTE APPLICATION OF HEALTH NET TO CONTINUE TRIAL, RESET ALL DATES PER CODE TO THE NEW TRIAL DATE, AND TO SET HEARING FOR MSJ'S PER CODE PRIOR TO NEW TRIAL DATE

72 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Status Conference (resubmission of joint proposal) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference re: submission of joint proposal)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketNotice (name extension) (JOINT APPENDIX OF EVIDENCE); Filed by Health Net of California, Inc. (Defendant); Healthcare LA, IPa (Defendant); Medpoint Management (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by Healthcare LA, IPa (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketSeparate Statement; Filed by Healthcare LA, IPa (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketBrief (name extension) (Appendix of Evidence in Support of Motion for Summary Adjudication); Filed by Healthcare LA, IPa (Defendant); Medpoint Management (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Healthcare LA, IPa (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketMotion for Summary Adjudication; Filed by Health Net of California, Inc. (Defendant); Healthcare LA, IPa (Defendant); Medpoint Management (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketSeparate Statement; Filed by Health Net of California, Inc. (Defendant); Healthcare LA, IPa (Defendant); Medpoint Management (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketMotion for Summary Adjudication; Filed by Healthcare LA, IPa (Defendant); Medpoint Management (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
152 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2017-05-24 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Health Net of California, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • DocketDEFENDANT HEALTH CARE OF CALIFORNIA, INC.'S PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 170.6; DECLARATION OF JUSTIN JONES RODRIGUEZ IN SUPPORT THEREOF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Melissa St. Clair (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL 1. WRONGFUL DEATH DUE TO THE BREACH OF THE DUTY OF GOOD FAITH AND FAITH DEALING; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****0849    Hearing Date: October 31, 2019    Dept: 50

THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUISITE PROOF OF DEPOSITS.  NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEDPOINT MANAGEMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where HEALTH NET OF CALIFORNIA, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WOLD, JAMES G

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCDONOUGH ERIC ROBERT