This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/07/2023 at 07:31:50 (UTC).

MELISSA MOLINA RUIZ, AN INDIVIDUAL VS LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORATATION AUTHORITY, A PUBLIC ENTITY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/14/2021 MELISSA MOLINA RUIZ, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORATATION AUTHORITY, A PUBLIC ENTITY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5584

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOLINA RUIZ AN INDIVIDUAL MELISSA

Defendants

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION A PUBLIC ENTITY

CITY OF HUNTINGTON PARK A PUBLIC ENTITY

CITY OF LOS ANGELES A PUBLIC ENTITY

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES A PUBLIC ENTITY

LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORATATION AUTHORITY A PUBLIC ENTITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROMERO VANESSA M.

Defendant Attorneys

ALMAZAN ARACELI

HUMPHREY CRAIG ALAN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/14/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/14/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/14/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/14/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

12/28/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

12/28/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Proof of Personal Service

3/20/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/20/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/21/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/23/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

4/18/2023: Answer

Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

4/21/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/21/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Request for Dismissal

4/21/2023: Request for Dismissal

Answer

4/21/2023: Answer

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -NOT ENTERED ADDRESS NOT ON RECORD

5/1/2023: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -NOT ENTERED ADDRESS NOT ON RECORD

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

5/2/2023: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2024
  • Hearing12/10/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2023
  • Hearing11/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2023
  • Hearing10/26/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Signed and Filed by: LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORATATION AUTHORITY, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant); As to: MELISSA MOLINA RUIZ, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Final Status Conference scheduled for 05/30/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 11/09/2023 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 10/26/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketDue to Clerical Error, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 11/09/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketDue to Clerical Error, Final Status Conference scheduled for 11/09/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 10/26/2023 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by MELISSA MOLINA RUIZ, AN INDIVIDUAL on 12/14/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by MELISSA MOLINA RUIZ, AN INDIVIDUAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: MELISSA MOLINA RUIZ, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF LOS ANGELES, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 05/30/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 12/10/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Daniel M. Crowley in Department 28 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: MELISSA MOLINA RUIZ, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); As to: LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORATATION AUTHORITY, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant); CITY OF HUNTINGTON PARK, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant); CITY OF LOS ANGELES, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: MELISSA MOLINA RUIZ, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); As to: LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORATATION AUTHORITY, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant); CITY OF HUNTINGTON PARK, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant); CITY OF LOS ANGELES, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: MELISSA MOLINA RUIZ, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); As to: LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORATATION AUTHORITY, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant); CITY OF HUNTINGTON PARK, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant); CITY OF LOS ANGELES, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less