Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2019 at 03:55:29 (UTC).

MELINDA KAYE LEE VS STEPHEN D FETT ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/29/2017 MELINDA KAYE LEE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STEPHEN D FETT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5610

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

LEE MELINDA KAYE

Defendants and Respondents

FETT NANCY L.

DOES 1 TO 100

FETT STEPHEN D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SUBLETTE CAMM. ESQ

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

JONES ROBYN N. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Unknown

2/7/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

9/12/2018: Minute Order

SUMMONS

3/29/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES

3/29/2017: COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

4/17/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

4/17/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

CIVIL DEPOSIT

5/12/2017: CIVIL DEPOSIT

DEMAND FOR JURY

5/12/2017: DEMAND FOR JURY

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

5/12/2017: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 5; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-10-01 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 5; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; No Appearance) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-09-12 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • Receipt; Filed by Stephen D. Fett (Defendant); Nancy L. Fett (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by Stephen D. Fett (Defendant); Nancy L. Fett (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • Answer; Filed by Stephen D. Fett (Defendant); Nancy L. Fett (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • DEMAND FOR JURY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Melinda Kaye Lee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Melinda Kaye Lee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Melinda Kaye Lee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SUBLETTE CAMM