This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/18/2022 at 04:57:30 (UTC).

MELEVY OSORIO VS FOUR SEASONS HOTELS LIMITED, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/02/2020 MELEVY OSORIO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against FOUR SEASONS HOTELS LIMITED, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL P. LINFIELD, DENNIS J. LANDIN and LAWRENCE P. RIFF. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8001

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHAEL P. LINFIELD

DENNIS J. LANDIN

LAWRENCE P. RIFF

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OSORIO MELEVY

Defendants

FOUR SEASONS HOTELS LIMITED A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA FOUR SEASONS HOTEL LOS ANGELES

BURTON WAY HOTELS LTD A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

BURTON WAY HOTELS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

BURTON WAY HOTELS LTD

FOUR SEASONS HOTELS LIMITED DBA FOUR SEASONS HOTEL LOS ANGELES

BURTON WAY HOTELS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

YOUNESSI RAMIN RAY

YOUNESSI RAMIN R.

Defendant Attorney

PARRY ADAM L.

 

Court Documents

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SAMVEL GESHGIAN IN CONNECTION WITH POST ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE

5/17/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SAMVEL GESHGIAN IN CONNECTION WITH POST ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

11/22/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

12/9/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Order - ORDER RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER

4/21/2021: Order - ORDER RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER

Notice of Ruling

4/26/2021: Notice of Ruling

Proof of Service by Mail

4/26/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Status Conference and Order

4/27/2021: Notice of Status Conference and Order

Proof of Service by Mail

4/29/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Ruling

4/29/2021: Notice of Ruling

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

4/15/2021: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS PENDING COMPLETION ...)

4/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS PENDING COMPLETION ...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)

4/21/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER) OF 04/21/2021, RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTERS

4/21/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER) OF 04/21/2021, RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTERS

Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

4/8/2021: Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STAY ACTION PENDING COMPLETION OF ARBITRATION

4/8/2021: Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STAY ACTION PENDING COMPLETION OF ARBITRATION

Proof of Service by Mail

4/8/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Objection - OBJECTION DEFENDANT FOUR SEASONS HOTELS LIMITED'S OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF HER OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

4/8/2021: Objection - OBJECTION DEFENDANT FOUR SEASONS HOTELS LIMITED'S OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF HER OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Response - RESPONSE DEFENDANT FOUR SEASONS HOTELS LIMITED'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO PURPORTED EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

4/8/2021: Response - RESPONSE DEFENDANT FOUR SEASONS HOTELS LIMITED'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO PURPORTED EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2022
  • Hearing05/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 51 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Arbitration Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (OF SAMVEL GESHGIAN IN CONNECTION WITH POST ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE); Filed by Melevy Osorio (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT); Filed by Melevy Osorio (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Four Seasons Hotels Limited (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Four Seasons Hotels Limited (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Status Conference and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Four Seasons Hotels Limited (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Four Seasons Hotels Limited (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION); Filed by Four Seasons Hotels Limited (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Filed by Four Seasons Hotels Limited (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Melevy Osorio (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Melevy Osorio (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Melevy Osorio (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Melevy Osorio (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Melevy Osorio (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Melevy Osorio (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BURTON WAY HOTELS LTD A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adam L. Parry