This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/07/2022 at 07:11:39 (UTC).

MELETHIA LATISE PRIDE VS HERTZ VEHICLES, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/28/2021 MELETHIA LATISE PRIDE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HERTZ VEHICLES, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7179

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PRIDE MELETHIA LATISE

Defendant

HERTZ VEHICLES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

POURMORADY KOUROSH MYER

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/28/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/28/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/28/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/28/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

3/1/2022: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/24/2024
  • Hearing12/24/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2023
  • Hearing06/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • Hearing06/13/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by MELETHIA LATISE PRIDE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MELETHIA LATISE PRIDE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MELETHIA LATISE PRIDE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by MELETHIA LATISE PRIDE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HERTZ VEHICLES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer POURMORADY KOUROSH M.