This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/13/2019 10:12:28

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 06/13/2019 a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce case was filed by MELENDEZ, IMELDA against GARCIA, OSCAR in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Whittier Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number XXXXXXX1089
  • Filing Date 06/13/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce
  • Jurisdiction Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Courthouse Whittier Courthouse
  • County Los Angeles
  • State California

Party Details

  • Respondent GARCIA OSCAR
  • Represented By
    • MORANDA BEVERLY
  • Petitioner MELENDEZ IMELDA
  • Represented By
    • WALKER BRIAN S

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2019
  • Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Respondent
  • 09/03/2019
  • Notice - Rejection (Request to enter default submitted 8/30/2019 -Response filed )
  • 08/30/2019
  • Declaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Petitioner
  • 08/30/2019
  • Request - Enter Default FL165 (Rejected ); Filed by Petitioner
  • 08/15/2019
  • Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner
  • 07/23/2019
  • Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent
  • 07/23/2019
  • Proof of Service - Mail; Filed by Respondent
  • 07/23/2019
  • Notice (- Of Related Case ); Filed by Respondent
  • 07/22/2019
  • Proof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner
  • 07/22/2019
  • Notice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition; Filed by Petitioner
  • 07/16/2019
  • Notice - Rejection (P.O.S. rec. 7/12/19 )
  • 07/12/2019
  • Proof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner
  • 07/09/2019
  • Notice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition; Filed by Petitioner
  • 06/20/2019
  • Notice - Rejection (fax filing; notice of related case; attorney is not on record )
  • 06/20/2019
  • Notice (Of Related Case ); Filed by Petitioner
  • 06/17/2019
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Petitioner
  • 06/13/2019
  • Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)
  • 06/13/2019
  • Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner
  • 06/13/2019
  • Summons; Filed by Petitioner
  • 06/13/2019
  • Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.