This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/25/2023 at 04:01:20 (UTC).

MELCHOR RENOI GONZALEZ VS AXS OPPORTUNITY FUND, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/28/2020 MELCHOR RENOI GONZALEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against AXS OPPORTUNITY FUND, LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL J. BUCKLEY. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0357

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL J. BUCKLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GONZALEZ MELCHOR RENOI

Defendants

AXS OPPORTUNITY FUND LLC

SUN VALLEY PARTNERSHIP LP

TOWN SQUARE M PROPERTIES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KOULLOUKIAN NAZO LEON

Defendant Attorneys

LEE W. DAN

LEE ASHLEY J.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

5/11/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

5/6/2022: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. CONTINUANCE;)

4/26/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. CONTINUANCE;)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

4/26/2022: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL STATUS CONFERENCE (PLEADING) RE: MOTION TO DECERTIFY...)

1/26/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL STATUS CONFERENCE (PLEADING) RE: MOTION TO DECERTIFY...)

Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT AXS OPPURTUNITY FUND, LLC

1/24/2022: Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT AXS OPPURTUNITY FUND, LLC

Status Report - STATUS REPORT BY DEFENDANTS AXS OPPORTUNITY FUND, LLC AND SUN VALLEY PARTNERSHIP LP RE: INFORMAL PLEADING CONFERENCE

1/24/2022: Status Report - STATUS REPORT BY DEFENDANTS AXS OPPORTUNITY FUND, LLC AND SUN VALLEY PARTNERSHIP LP RE: INFORMAL PLEADING CONFERENCE

Declaration - DECLARATION OF NAZO KOULLOUKIAN RE OSC RE DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION

12/27/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF NAZO KOULLOUKIAN RE OSC RE DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION

Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL

12/16/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

11/24/2021: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE FILING OF CLASS CERTIFICATION M...)

11/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE FILING OF CLASS CERTIFICATION M...)

Message Board Posting - MESSAGE BOARD POSTING RE CONTINUANCE

11/10/2020: Message Board Posting - MESSAGE BOARD POSTING RE CONTINUANCE

Case Management Order

11/13/2020: Case Management Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

11/13/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Initial Status Conference Report - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE CLASS ACTION RESPONSE STATEMENT

9/16/2020: Initial Status Conference Report - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE CLASS ACTION RESPONSE STATEMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE CONTINUANCE OF INITIAL STATUS C...)

9/16/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE CONTINUANCE OF INITIAL STATUS C...)

Proof of Service by Mail

7/10/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/10/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference scheduled for 06/03/2022 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 1 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Melchor Renoi Gonzalez on 05/28/2020, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Melchor Renoi Gonzalez, causes Cause of Action 9 only

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Melchor Renoi Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Melchor Renoi Gonzalez on 05/28/2020, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Melchor Renoi Gonzalez as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Melchor Renoi Gonzalez on 05/28/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Melchor Renoi Gonzalez, causes 1-8 only

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Pursuant to the Request for Dismissal filed by Melchor Renoi Gonzalez on 05/06/2022, Cause(s) of Action 1-8 only in Complaint filed by Melchor Renoi Gonzalez on 05/28/2020 is dismissed with prejudice. Filed Date changed from 05/09/2022 to 05/06/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Melchor Renoi Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference scheduled for 06/03/2022 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re. Continuance;)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order re Newly Filed Class Action) of 06/16/2020, Initial Status Conference Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketInitial Status Conference scheduled for 09/21/2020 at 09:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Town Square M Properties LLC (Defendant): Organization Name changed from Town Square M Properties Llc. to Town Square M Properties LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketAddress for Nazo Leon Koulloukian (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Daniel J. Buckley in Department 1 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Melchor Renoi Gonzalez (Plaintiff); As to: AXS Opportunity Fund, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Melchor Renoi Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Class Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less