This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/18/2021 at 12:07:14 (UTC).

MELCHOR RENOI GONZALEZ VS AXS OPPORTUNITY FUND, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/28/2020 MELCHOR RENOI GONZALEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against AXS OPPORTUNITY FUND, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL J. BUCKLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0357

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL J. BUCKLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GONZALEZ MELCHOR RENOI

Defendants

AXS OPPORTUNITY FUND LLC

TOWN SQUARE M PROPERTIES LLC.

SUN VALLEY PARTNERSHIP LP

TOWN SQUARE M PROPERTIES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KOULLOUKIAN NAZO LEON

Defendant Attorneys

LEE ASHLEY J.

LEE W. DAN

LEE W. KEE

 

Court Documents

Message Board Posting - MESSAGE BOARD POSTING RE CONTINUANCE

11/10/2020: Message Board Posting - MESSAGE BOARD POSTING RE CONTINUANCE

Case Management Order

11/13/2020: Case Management Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

11/13/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Initial Status Conference Report - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE CLASS ACTION RESPONSE STATEMENT

9/16/2020: Initial Status Conference Report - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE CLASS ACTION RESPONSE STATEMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE CONTINUANCE OF INITIAL STATUS C...)

9/16/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE CONTINUANCE OF INITIAL STATUS C...)

Proof of Service by Mail

7/10/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/10/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Appearance

6/19/2020: Notice of Appearance

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

6/24/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Proof of Service by Mail

6/24/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION)

6/16/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION)

Initial Status Conference Order

6/16/2020: Initial Status Conference Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION) OF 06/16/2020, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

6/16/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION) OF 06/16/2020, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/28/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/28/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/28/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

5/28/2020: Complaint

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2021
  • Hearing11/22/2021 at 16:00 PM in Department 1 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Initial Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketMessage Board Posting (re Continuance); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • Docketat 3:01 PM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketJoint Initial Status Conference Class Action Response Statement; Filed by AXS Opportunity Fund, LLC (Defendant); Sun Valley Partnership Lp (Defendant); Town Square M Properties LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re Continuance of Initial Status C...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Melchor Renoi Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Filed by AXS Opportunity Fund, LLC (Defendant); Sun Valley Partnership Lp (Defendant); Town Square M Properties LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • Docketat 09:17 AM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Newly Filed Class Action) of 06/16/2020, Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re Newly Filed Class Action)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Melchor Renoi Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Melchor Renoi Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Town Square M Properties, LLC, is a litigant

Latest cases where SUN VALLEY PARTNERSHIP LP A DELAWARE LTD PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases where AXS Opportunity Fund, LLP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KOULLOUKIAN NAZO LEON