Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/06/2021 at 01:36:55 (UTC).

MELANIE MCCRACKEN, ET AL. VS RIOT GAMES, INC.

Case Summary

On 11/06/2018 MELANIE MCCRACKEN filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against RIOT GAMES, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CAROLYN B. KUHL and ELIHU M. BERLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3957

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CAROLYN B. KUHL

ELIHU M. BERLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Not Classified By Court

NEGRON JESSICA

MCCRACKEN MELANIE

DEPARTMENT OF FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING

DOWNIE GABRIELA

DIVISION OF LABOR STANDARDS ENFORCEMENT

Defendants

RIOT GAMES INC.

RIOT GAMES PRODUCTIONS INC.

RIOT GAMES DIRECT INC.

RIOT GAMES MERCHANDISE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

SABA RYAN D

SARRIS NICHOLAS WAYNE

HARRISON GENIE ELIZABETH

LOVRETOVICH JOSEPH MARK

PROCTOR MELANIE LEA

WIPPER JANETTE L

KAPLAN ROBERT A.

LAH ANDREW

FIELDS ANDREA LAUREN

TRAN OLIVIA NGOC

KAPLAN ROBERT A

TOYAMA KAITLIN NAOMI

SHIM GRACE HYEJU

MAYEDA MARI

SMITH KATHERINE V

CONWAY CATHERINE ANNE

FARHANG MICHAEL MASSEY

PHAN TIFFANY X.

Plaintiff and Not Classified By Court Attorneys

SHIM GRACE HYEJU

MAYEDA MARI

TRASOVAN IRINA

KELLY PATRICIA MARY

 

Court Documents

Answer - DEFENDANT RIOT GAMES, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT

2/25/2021: Answer - DEFENDANT RIOT GAMES, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF KAITLIN TOYAMA IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF-INTERVENOR DEPARTMENT OF FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY PENDING ARBITRATION AND EXHIBIT A

11/10/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF KAITLIN TOYAMA IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF-INTERVENOR DEPARTMENT OF FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY PENDING ARBITRATION AND EXHIBIT A

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO FURTHER MODIFY TIME TO FILE BRIEFS REGARDING EXPEDITED DISCOVERY

11/17/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO FURTHER MODIFY TIME TO FILE BRIEFS REGARDING EXPEDITED DISCOVERY

Declaration - DECLARATION OF CATHERINE A. CONWAY IN SUPPORT OF RIOT GAMES, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OF EMPLOYEE PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS

11/20/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF CATHERINE A. CONWAY IN SUPPORT OF RIOT GAMES, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OF EMPLOYEE PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS

Reply - PLAINTIFF-INTERVENOR DEPARTMENT OF FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING'S REPLY RE: MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS TO PROVIDE FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR DOCUMENTS

11/23/2020: Reply - PLAINTIFF-INTERVENOR DEPARTMENT OF FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING'S REPLY RE: MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS TO PROVIDE FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR DOCUMENTS

Supplemental Declaration - SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF MIA MUNRO IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITIONS TO DEFENDANT RIOT GAMES, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OF EMPLOYEE PLAINTIFFS' CLAIM

12/16/2020: Supplemental Declaration - SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF MIA MUNRO IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITIONS TO DEFENDANT RIOT GAMES, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OF EMPLOYEE PLAINTIFFS' CLAIM

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - DEPARTMENT OF FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING'S PROOF OF SERVICE

7/8/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - DEPARTMENT OF FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING'S PROOF OF SERVICE

Order - ORDER GRANTING DFEH'S MOTION TO INTERVENE

7/15/2020: Order - ORDER GRANTING DFEH'S MOTION TO INTERVENE

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE (NOT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT) -NOTICE OF RULINGS

7/13/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE (NOT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT) -NOTICE OF RULINGS

Other - - DEPARTMENT OF FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSINGS REPLY: MOTION TO INTERVENE

3/11/2020: Other - - DEPARTMENT OF FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSINGS REPLY: MOTION TO INTERVENE

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE VIENNA NGUYEN, CSR # 13137

1/31/2020: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE VIENNA NGUYEN, CSR # 13137

Objection - OBJECTION TO THE DIVISION OF LABOR STANDARDS ENFORCEMENT'S NEW EVIDENCE OFFERED IN ITS REPLY TO THE OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE

1/28/2020: Objection - OBJECTION TO THE DIVISION OF LABOR STANDARDS ENFORCEMENT'S NEW EVIDENCE OFFERED IN ITS REPLY TO THE OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT

1/9/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF GRACE SHIM IN SUPPORT OF THE DEPARTMENT OF FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING'S OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT

1/8/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF GRACE SHIM IN SUPPORT OF THE DEPARTMENT OF FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING'S OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE JANE HONG-ELSEY, CSR # 11975

12/4/2019: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE JANE HONG-ELSEY, CSR # 11975

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

9/5/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

296 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2021
  • Hearing07/12/2021 at 11:00 AM in Department 6 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Seal DFEH'S May 10, 2021 Motion for Protective Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • Hearing07/12/2021 at 11:00 AM in Department 6 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 6, Elihu M. Berle, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Protective Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 6, Elihu M. Berle, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Protective Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 6, Elihu M. Berle, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Seal (DFEH'S Ex Parte Application and Supporting Documents)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 6, Elihu M. Berle, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Seal (DFEH'S Ex Parte Application and Supporting Documents) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketNotice Of Lodging Of Documents Conditionally Under Seal; Filed by Department of Fair Employment and Housing (Plaintiff in Intervention)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketReply (in Support of Motion to Seal DFEH's April 07, 2021 Ex Parte Application and Supporting Documents); Filed by Riot Games, Inc. (Defendant); Riot Games Direct, Inc. (Defendant); Riot Games Merchandise, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff-Intervenor Department Of Fair Employment And Housings Objections To Evidence Submitted By Defendants With Defendants' Opposition To DFEH's Motion For Protective Order And For Corrective Notice; Filed by Department of Fair Employment and Housing (Plaintiff in Intervention)

    Read MoreRead Less
343 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Docketat 08:27 AM in Department 12, Carolyn B. Kuhl, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 12/20/2018); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Melanie McCracken (Plaintiff); Jessica Negron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Melanie McCracken (Plaintiff); Jessica Negron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • DocketComplaint (1st); Filed by Melanie McCracken (Plaintiff); Jessica Negron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RIOT GAMES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAYEDA MARI

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TRASOVAN IRINA