This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/15/2023 at 19:31:20 (UTC).

MELANIE J., ET AL. VS COMPTON UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, A GOVERNMENT ENTITY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/17/2022 MELANIE J , filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against COMPTON UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, A GOVERNMENT ENTITY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0565

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

J. AN INDIVIDUAL ALBERTO

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

COMPTON UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT A GOVERNMENT ENTITY

DOES 1 THROUGH 50 INCLUSIVE

HUERTA AN INDIVIDUAL SERGIO ULISES

Cross Defendant and Defendant

HUERTA AN INDIVIDUAL SERGIO ULISES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROCK D. AARON

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

QUILLER DOMINIC A

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/17/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

11/17/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/17/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/18/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

11/18/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/4/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

1/24/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Cross-Complaint

2/9/2023: Cross-Complaint

Answer

2/9/2023: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/9/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

4/14/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

5/11/2023: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2023
  • Hearing06/29/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 200 West Compton Blvd., Compton, CA 90220; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department B Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 06/29/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Compton Courthouse in Department B - Hon. Fumiko Wassermaneffective 04/24/2023; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Compton Unified School District, a government entity (Defendant); As to: Melanie J. (Plaintiff); Alberto J., an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Compton Unified School District, a government entity (Defendant); As to: Sergio Ulises Huerta, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: Compton Unified School District, a government entity (Defendant); As to: Sergio Ulises Huerta, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Melanie J. (Plaintiff); As to: Compton Unified School District, a government entity (Defendant); Service Date: 01/09/2023; Service Cost: 119.25; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Melanie J. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. George F. Bird in Department B Compton Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Signed and Filed by: Melanie J. (Plaintiff); Alberto J., an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Compton Unified School District, a government entity (Defendant); Sergio Ulises Huerta, an individual (Defendant); Does 1 through 50, inclusive (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem: Filed By: Melanie J. (Plaintiff),Alberto J., an individual (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 11/18/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Melanie J. (Plaintiff); Alberto J., an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Compton Unified School District, a government entity (Defendant); Sergio Ulises Huerta, an individual (Defendant); Does 1 through 50, inclusive (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Melanie J. (Plaintiff); Alberto J., an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Compton Unified School District, a government entity (Defendant); Sergio Ulises Huerta, an individual (Defendant); Does 1 through 50, inclusive (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less