This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/10/2021 at 22:17:02 (UTC).

MELANIE GONZALEZ VS DENCO ENTERPRISES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/20/2020 MELANIE GONZALEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against DENCO ENTERPRISES, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELIHU M. BERLE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1287

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELIHU M. BERLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GONZALEZ MELANIE

Defendants

DENCO ENTERPRISES INC. DBA DENNY'S #7042

MARWAH RAI

DENNY'S CORPORATION

DFO LLC

MARWAH RAJNI

DENCO FAMILY INC.

DENNY'S CORPORATION DBA DENNY'S #7042

MARWAH RAJINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GRESEN SOLOMON E.

HABASHY JOHN REFAAT

BUDA TIFFANY N. ESQ.

GRESEN SOLOMON E. ESQ.

HABASHY JOHN R. ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

CARRIGAN JOHN R. JR.

MILLER MICHELE BALLARD

CARRIGAN JOHN RICHARD

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF PAYMENT OF CHANGE OF VENUE FEE

4/14/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF PAYMENT OF CHANGE OF VENUE FEE

Notice - NOTICE OF PAYMENT OF CASE FILING FEE TO SAN BERNARDINO SUPERIOR COURT

4/14/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF PAYMENT OF CASE FILING FEE TO SAN BERNARDINO SUPERIOR COURT

Certificate - CLERK'S CERTIFICATION OF REPRODUCED COURT DOCUMENTS

4/26/2021: Certificate - CLERK'S CERTIFICATION OF REPRODUCED COURT DOCUMENTS

Notice of Outgoing Transfer

4/26/2021: Notice of Outgoing Transfer

Receipt for Transmitted Record

4/26/2021: Receipt for Transmitted Record

RECEIPT - RETURNED RECEIPT FOR TRANSMITTED RECORD - SAN BERNARDINO CO- CIVSB2112416

6/1/2021: RECEIPT - RETURNED RECEIPT FOR TRANSMITTED RECORD - SAN BERNARDINO CO- CIVSB2112416

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

4/8/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: SETTLEMENT)

1/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: SETTLEMENT)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS; [PROPOSED] ORDER

1/13/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS; [PROPOSED] ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SETTLEMENT)

10/26/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SETTLEMENT)

Order - ORDER RE: DISMISSAL

10/6/2020: Order - ORDER RE: DISMISSAL

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

9/15/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Request for Dismissal

9/15/2020: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

9/21/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 09/21/2020

9/21/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 09/21/2020

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS DENNY'S CORPORATION, DFO, LLC; GURBAX RAI MARWAH (ERRONEOUSLY NAMED AS "RAI MARWAH") AND RAJNI MARWAH (ERRONEOUSLY NAMED AS "RAJINA MARWAH")

9/30/2020: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS DENNY'S CORPORATION, DFO, LLC; GURBAX RAI MARWAH (ERRONEOUSLY NAMED AS "RAI MARWAH") AND RAJNI MARWAH (ERRONEOUSLY NAMED AS "RAJINA MARWAH")

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE

9/30/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

7/24/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketReturned Receipt for Transmitted Record - San Bernardino Co- CIVSB2112416; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketClerk's Certification of Reproduced Court Documents; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Outgoing Transfer; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketReceipt for Transmitted Record; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Payment of Case Filing Fee to San Bernardino Superior Court); Filed by Melanie Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Payment of Change of Venue Fee); Filed by Melanie Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 6, Elihu M. Berle, Presiding; Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Michele Ballard Miller (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketStipulation To Consolidate Actions; [PROPOSED] Order; Filed by Melanie Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 6, Elihu M. Berle, Presiding; Status Conference (reSettlement) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Melanie Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Melanie Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Melanie Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Melanie Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Melanie Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Melanie Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Melanie Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Melanie Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DENCO FAMILY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where DENCO ENTERPRISES INC. DBA DENNY'S #7042 is a litigant

Latest cases where DFO LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Denny's Incorporated is a litigant