This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/17/2021 at 17:20:42 (UTC).

MELAKU LEULSEGED VS MULATU M GETACHEW, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/14/2021 MELAKU LEULSEGED filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MULATU M GETACHEW. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5930

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEULSEGED MELAKU

Defendants

GETACHEW MULATU M

UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GEBRIEL GIRMA H.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2024
  • Hearing07/10/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • Hearing01/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • Hearing12/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Melaku Leulseged (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Melaku Leulseged (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Melaku Leulseged (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GEBRIEL GIRMA HAILE