This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/15/2022 at 19:40:05 (UTC).

MEJIA MARIA VS JOSE LUIS MEJIA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/17/2022 MEJIA MARIA filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against JOSE LUIS MEJIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9844

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARIA MEJIA

Defendants

HERNANDEZ SILAS M

MARTINEZ VILMA

MEJIA JOSE LUIS

MEJIA LILIAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

POURMORADY KOUROSH MYER

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

6/20/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

6/17/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

6/17/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

6/17/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/17/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/17/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/17/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

6/17/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/17/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Lis Pendens

6/28/2022: Notice of Lis Pendens

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2022
  • Hearing10/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 51 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by MEJIA MARIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by MEJIA MARIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MEJIA MARIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MEJIA MARIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer POURMORADY KOUROSH M.