This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/16/2023 at 03:47:35 (UTC).

MEI LING CHEN ET AL VS STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF

Case Summary

On 07/26/2017 MEI LING CHEN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HOLLY E. KENDIG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9426

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HOLLY E. KENDIG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ZHAO CHUN SHENG

CHEN MEI LING

VIKING INSURANCE COMPANY OF WISCONSIN

Defendants

STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF

ESTATE OF BRAYAN ANDRADE

STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES

OROZCO ROBERTO JUAREZ

LAC+USC MEDICAL CENTER

STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES

SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JOHNSTON THOMAS JOSEPH

MEISSNER ALEXANDER GONG

YUTER ALAN B

Defendant Attorneys

GOMES DAVID ALLEN

GYSLER JENNIFER E

RICH STEVEN MATTHEW

 

Court Documents

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

4/8/2021: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

5/8/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER DISCHARGING STAKEHOLDER)

8/4/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER DISCHARGING STAKEHOLDER)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE HEARING ON VIKING INSURANCE COMPANY OF WISCONSINS MOTION FOR ORDER DISCHARGING STAKEHOLDER, TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE, AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

7/12/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE HEARING ON VIKING INSURANCE COMPANY OF WISCONSINS MOTION FOR ORDER DISCHARGING STAKEHOLDER, TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE, AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL)

6/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

4/9/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ALAN YUTER IN SUPPORT OF VIKING INSURANCE COMPANY OF WISCONSIN'S MOTION FOR ORDER DISCHARGING STAKEHOLDER AND FOR RELATED ORDERS

4/8/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ALAN YUTER IN SUPPORT OF VIKING INSURANCE COMPANY OF WISCONSIN'S MOTION FOR ORDER DISCHARGING STAKEHOLDER AND FOR RELATED ORDERS

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF PAMELA LANDIS IN SUPPORT OF VIKING INSURANCE COMPANY OF WISCONSIN'S MOTION FOR ORDER DISCHARGING ST AK.EH OLDER AND FOR RELATED ORDERS

4/8/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF PAMELA LANDIS IN SUPPORT OF VIKING INSURANCE COMPANY OF WISCONSIN'S MOTION FOR ORDER DISCHARGING ST AK.EH OLDER AND FOR RELATED ORDERS

Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER NOTICE OF MOTION AND VIKING INSURANCE COMPANY OF WISCONSINS MOTION FOR ORDER DISCHARGING STAKEHOLDER AND FOR RELATED ORDERS; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT; DECLARATION OF

4/8/2021: Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER NOTICE OF MOTION AND VIKING INSURANCE COMPANY OF WISCONSINS MOTION FOR ORDER DISCHARGING STAKEHOLDER AND FOR RELATED ORDERS; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT; DECLARATION OF

Request for Dismissal

2/23/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/25/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ALEXANDER G. MEISSNER IN RESPONSE TO OSC

4/1/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ALEXANDER G. MEISSNER IN RESPONSE TO OSC

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE) OF 01/25/2021

1/25/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE) OF 01/25/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

1/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19) OF 06/17/2020

6/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19) OF 06/17/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19)

6/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19)

Request for Dismissal

12/13/2019: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

12/30/2019: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion for Order Notice of Motion and Viking Insurance Company of Wisconsin?s Motion for Order Discharging Stakeholder and for Related Orders; Memorandum in Support; Declaration of Pamela Landis; Declaration of Alan Yuter; Stipulation for Entry of Judgment; Proposed Orde: Filed By: Viking Insurance Company of Wisconsin (Plaintiff in Intervention); Result: Granted; Result Date: 08/04/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion for Order DISCHARGING STAKEHOLDER)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion for Order DISCHARGING STAKEHOLDER scheduled for 08/04/2021 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 updated: Result Date to 08/04/2021; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketNotice Notice Hearing on Viking Insurance Company of Wisconsins Motion for Order Discharging Stakeholder, Trial Setting Conference, and Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal; Filed by: Viking Insurance Company of Wisconsin (Plaintiff in Intervention); As to: Mei Ling Chen (Plaintiff); Chun Sheng Zhao (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 08/04/2021 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference scheduled for 08/04/2021 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketPursuant to oral stipulation, Trial Setting Conference scheduled for 06/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 08/04/2021 01:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketPursuant to oral stipulation, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 06/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 08/04/2021 01:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion for Order DISCHARGING STAKEHOLDER scheduled for 08/04/2021 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
109 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2018
  • DocketDocument:Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketDocument:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketDocument:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • DocketDocument:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketDocument:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • DocketCalendaring:Final Status Conference 05/15/19 at 10:00 am Marc D. Gross

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • DocketCalendaring:Jury Trial 05/28/19 at 8:30 am Marc D. Gross

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • DocketCalendaring:OSC RE Dismissal 07/27/20 at 8:30 am Yolanda Orozco

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DocketCase Filed/Opened:Motor Vehicle - PI/PD/WD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DocketDocument:Complaint Filed by: N/A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

b"

Case Number: ****9426 Hearing Date: August 4, 2021 Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

MEI LING CHEN, ET AL.,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT

OF TRANSPORTATION, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: ****9426

[TENTATIVE] ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ORDER DISCHARGING STAKEHOLDER

Dept. 31

1:30 p.m.

August 4, 2021

1. Background

Plaintiffs, Mei Ling Chen (“Chen”) and Chun Sheng Zhao (“Zhao”) (collectively, “Plaintiffs”) filed this action against Defendants, State of California Department of Transportation and Estate of Brayan Andrade (the “Estate”) for dangerous condition of public property and negligence relating to a motor vehicle accident.

At this time, Viking Insurance Company of Wisconsin (“Viking”) moves for an order discharging stakeholder from liability. Viking asserts it provided Brayan Andrade with a California auto insurance policy with a $30,000 aggregate limit for the sum of all claims against the policy required to be paid by Viking. On September 2, 2016, A vehicle driven by Andrade struck Chen’s vehicle. Occupants of Andrade's vehicle at the time of the accident were Brayan Andrade Pacheco and Roberto Juarez Orozco (“Orozco”). Occupants of Chen's vehicle at the time of the accident were Mei Ling Chen, Chun Sheng Zhao, and Sharon Zhao. Chen and Zhao filed this action for personal injuries against the Estate for Andrade’s negligence in causing the accident. Orozco filed a different action, Case No. BC718513, for his injuries from the accident. On August 30, 2019, Viking filed a complaint-in-interpleader naming various potential claimants.

Viking provides it is willing to deposit the entire $30,000 policy limit with the Clerk of the Court and seeks to be discharged from any further liability to any claimants. Viking asserts multiple defendants-in-intervention have claimed zero interest in the funds. Viking states Chen, Zhao, and Orozco claim an interest in the funds. Further, Viking avers the court should discharge Viking from liability and a judgment for dismissal with prejudice from this action. As of July 30, 2021, no opposition to the motion has been filed.

2. Motion Discharging Stakeholder

If a defendant-stakeholder claims no interest in the funds or property it holds, the defendant may apply to the court for permission to deposit the money or property with the court clerk, and for an order discharging him or her from further liability to the adverse claimants. Such order may also dismiss the stakeholder. (CCP ;; 386(a), 386.5.) The stakeholder may also seek reimbursement of costs and reasonable attorney fees incurred. (CCP ; 386.6.) The Court may, in its discretion, order payment thereof out of the funds deposited by the stakeholder, and ultimately, such payment may be charged to one or more of the adverse claimants in the final judgment. (CCP ; 386.6.)

Here, Viking asserts it filed its complaint in interpleader to avoid multiplicity of actions and will deposit with the Clerk of the Court the Policy Limit of the insurance policy in the amount of $30,000. Viking avers it disavows any interest in the disputed funds and seeks to be discharged from liability. Additionally, on April 8, 2021, Viking filed a Stipulation for Entry of Judgment signed by the parties providing the balance of the interpleaded funds was to be divided between Orozco, Chen, and Zhao as follows: to Orozco the sum of $11,000; to Chen the sum of $4,000; and to Zhao the sum of $15,000.

Viking’s motion for an order discharging stakeholder is granted. Viking is hereby discharged and dismissed from this case and released from any and all liability to any and all of the defendants in the above-entitled action for, on account of, or in connection with, any transaction, matter, happening, or thing in any way arising out of the rights and obligations of the parties, and their successors and assigns, with respect to the funds interpleaded with the Court herein, or any part thereof, pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 386.5.

The stipulation is hereby approved and granted. The sum of $11,000 shall be paid to Orozco; the sum of $4,000 shall be paid to Chen, and the sum of $15,000 shall be paid to Zhao.

Viking is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept31@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org. If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative. If the parties do not submit on the tentative, they should arrange to appear remotely.

Dated this 4th day of August, 2021

Hon. Teresa Sanchez-Gordon

Judge of the Superior Court

"