This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/23/2021 at 15:47:07 (UTC).

MEHRNAZ TAAT VS ACELL, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/28/2021 MEHRNAZ TAAT filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ACELL, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0304

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TAAT MEHRNAZ

Defendants

ACELL INC.

INTEGRA LIFESCIENCES CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BIBIYAN DAVID D.

Defendant Attorney

GIOVANNONE JOHN RICHARD

 

Court Documents

Status Conference Statement - INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

7/16/2021: Status Conference Statement - INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Answer

7/22/2021: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

7/23/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice - DEFENDANTS' NOTICE TO STATE COURT AND ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT

7/23/2021: Notice - DEFENDANTS' NOTICE TO STATE COURT AND ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

7/23/2021: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

7/28/2021: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT)

7/28/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT)

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

7/14/2021: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

7/14/2021: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT'S MINUTE ORDER AND INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

6/30/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT'S MINUTE ORDER AND INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Order - INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

6/22/2021: Order - INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/2/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 06/22/2021, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

6/22/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 06/22/2021, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

6/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/28/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

5/28/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/28/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

5/28/2021: Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2021
  • Hearing11/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 9 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • Docketat 4:00 PM in Department 9, Yvette M. Palazuelos, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Removal to Federal Court)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 9, Yvette M. Palazuelos, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketDefendants' Notice to State Court and Adverse Party of Removal of Action to Federal Court; Filed by Acell, Inc. (Defendant); Integra Lifesciences Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Initial Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Acell, Inc. (Defendant); Integra Lifesciences Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Statement; Filed by Mehrnaz Taat (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Court's Minute Order and Initial Status Conference Order; Filed by Mehrnaz Taat (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • Docketat 08:00 AM in Department 9, Yvette M. Palazuelos, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Setting Initial Status Conference) of 06/22/2021, Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Setting Initial Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Mehrnaz Taat (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Mehrnaz Taat (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Mehrnaz Taat (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACELL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where INTEGRA LIFESCIENCES CORPORATION is a litigant